Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rastislav Hodul (until 2007-10-06) | 1969-01-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rene Tretschok (until 2007-10-06) | 1968-12-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sven Roggentin (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-08-08 | |||
13 | Sebastian Rauch (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-09-20 | |||
27 | Carsten Busch (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-08-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Robert Littmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-02-02 | |||
3 | Martin Neubert (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-10-30 | |||
5 | Maik Neumann (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-06-15 | |||
6 | Andreas Lucke (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-09-10 | |||
7 | Matthias Rudolph (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
24 | Ivica Vukadin (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-12-04 | |||
31 | Bastian Zenk (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-07-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Patrick Moritz (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-10-22 | |||
10 | Sven Hartwig (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-07-08 | |||
15 | Till Wedemann (until 2007-06-03) | 1986-04-26 | |||
16 | Alexander Arsovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-02-21 | |||
17 | Julian Prochnow (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-07-01 | |||
18 | Jan Mutschler (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-09-11 | |||
20 | Patrick Deupert (until 2007-12-31) | 1987-08-31 | |||
21 | Slavomir Lukac (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-12-08 | |||
23 | Rene Tretschok (until 2007-06-30) | 1968-12-23 | |||
25 | Markus Goede (from 2006-12-01) (until 2007-12-31) | 1988-09-06 | |||
25 | Andre Zielke (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-07-15 | |||
33 | Bjorn Laars (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-12-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Yaw Donkor (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-05-24 | |||
11 | Aymen Ben-Hatira (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-11-12 | |||
19 | Daniel Arsovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-01-14 | |||
22 | Jack Grubert (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-03-06 | |||
28 | Shergo Biran (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-12-31) | 1979-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2006-10-24 19:15 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |