Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Ferenc Rott (until 2009-06-30) | 1970-10-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (from 2006-10-07) (until 2009-04-20) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Gino Lettieri (until 2006-10-06) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Richard Hasa (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-03-27 | ||||
Gianni Lettieri (until 2006-10-06) | 1970-03-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bastian Becker (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-06-21 | |||
23 | Sven Schmitt (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-12-27 | |||
25 | Jorg Staniczek (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-11-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerrit Burk (from 2007-01-30) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-06-13 | ||||
Pascal Pellowski (from 2006-11-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1988-12-18 | ||||
3 | Achim Pfuderer (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
4 | Stephan Hanke (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-10-19 | |||
5 | Adiele Echendu (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-11-17 | |||
14 | Patrick Kaesberg (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-10-08 | |||
16 | Marcus Mann (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-03-14 | |||
17 | Alexander Konjevic (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-10-17 | |||
18 | Christian Wiesner (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-09-22 | |||
19 | Christian Eckerlin (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-11-16 | |||
19 | Peter Endres (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-01-04 | |||
20 | Mergim Mavraj (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-06-09 | |||
27 | Richard Hasa (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-03-27 | |||
33 | Christian Remmers (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-02-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Silas Rauschmayr (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-05-25 | |||
2 | Adrian Mahr (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-02-14 | |||
6 | Stefan Leitl (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
7 | Alberto Mendez (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-10-24 | |||
8 | Zivojin Juskic (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-12-16 | |||
9 | Sebastiao (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-08-24 | |||
39 | Alvano Kroh (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-07-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Manuel Do Vale Lopez (from 2006-11-11) (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-04-17 | ||||
10 | Bertrand Bingana (from 2007-01-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-01-02 | |||
10 | Mikheil Sajaia (until 2007-01-29) | 1976-12-08 | |||
11 | Nico Beigang (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-08-24 | |||
13 | Markus Beierle (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-06-02 | |||
15 | Andreas Fischer (until 2006-12-31) | 1981-11-07 | |||
19 | Alexander Geiger (until 2006-12-31) | 1984-12-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 17:00 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |