Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Kramer (until 2011-06-30) | 1967-03-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Guido Graf (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-03-23 | |||
20 | Julius Buscher (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-11-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Sebastian Hempel (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-09-16 | |||
3 | Ersin Cavlan (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-02-04 | |||
7 | Ralf Jauernick (until 2010-06-30) | 1971-11-13 | |||
15 | Tolga Ulutas (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-04-18 | |||
22 | Thomas Hombeul (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-06-07 | |||
24 | Sascha Watzlawik (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-11-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Andreas Gruber (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-08-26 | |||
5 | Sascha Breitbach (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-06-29 | |||
6 | Martin Kohns (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-09-06 | |||
8 | Dirk Schroder (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-06-06 | |||
11 | Sebastian Krautscheid (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-02-12 | |||
12 | Masaki Miura (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-04-04 | |||
13 | Roland Walgenbach (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-09-07 | |||
16 | Andreas Felgner (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-01-06 | |||
18 | Almir Deljo (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-08-17 | |||
19 | Carsten Bent (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-11-12 | |||
21 | Adrian Purowski (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-02-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Thomas Kahler (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-04-17 | |||
10 | Robert Zimnol (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-05-02 | |||
14 | Serkan Ozturk (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-08-31 | |||
23 | Vitali Karpov (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-01-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 15:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |