Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Auer (from 2007-01-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1971-07-15 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Rapolder (from 2007-04-25) (until 2009-12-13) | 1958-05-29 | ||||
Milan Sasic (until 2007-04-23) | 1958-10-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Koschinat (until 2009-12-13) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Klaus Sussmeyer (until 2006-12-31) | 1960-03-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Peter Auer (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-07-15 | |||
23 | Dennis Eilhoff (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-07-31 | |||
28 | Djordje Pantic (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-12-31) | 1980-01-27 | |||
33 | Michael Gurski (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-03-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ralf Klingmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-11-08 | ||||
2 | Brenny Evers (until 2008-07-25) | 1978-11-08 | |||
3 | Frank Wiblishauser (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | |||
5 | Anthony Tieku (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-03-16 | |||
6 | Nikola Malbasa (until 2006-12-31) | 1977-09-12 | |||
8 | Martin Forkel (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-07-22 | |||
16 | Josh Grenier (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-07-16 | |||
18 | Andreas Richter (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-09-15 | |||
24 | Matej Mavric (from 2007-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-01-29 | |||
25 | Alassane Ouedraogo (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-09-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eldin Hadzic (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-11-02 | ||||
Domenico Cozza (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-01-18 | ||||
4 | Rudiger Ziehl (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-10-26 | |||
6 | Christian Holzer (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-01-20 | |||
10 | Anel Dzaka (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-09-19 | |||
14 | Christof Babatz (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-09-03 | |||
17 | Philipp Langen (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | |||
20 | Ferydoon Zandi (from 2006-09-08) (until 2006-12-31) | 1979-04-26 | |||
21 | Goran Sukalo (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-08-24 | |||
22 | Emil Noll (from 2006-12-21) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-11-21 | |||
26 | Evangelos Nessos (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-06-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Silvio Adzic (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-09-23 | |||
9 | Stefan Maierhofer (from 2007-01-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-08-16 | |||
9 | Dimitrijus Guscinas (until 2007-01-31) | 1975-12-12 | |||
11 | Salif Keita (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-10-19 | |||
13 | Johannes Rahn (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-16 | |||
15 | Bakary Diakite (from 2007-01-05) (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-11-09 | |||
19 | Filip Lovric (until 2007-06-30) | 1988-01-18 | |||
24 | Joseph Olumide (until 2006-12-31) | 1987-10-10 | |||
27 | Kenan Sahin (until 2008-01-30) | 1984-10-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 15:30 |
1 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |