Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Volker Ippig (until 2007-08-06) | 1963-01-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Erkenbrecher (from 2007-03-05) (until 2007-10-15) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Torsten Flocken (from 2007-03-01) (until 2007-03-04) | 1966-07-18 | ||||
Bernd Hollerbach (until 2007-02-28) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gregor Strebel (until 2007-06-30) | 1962-04-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Frech (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-03-26 | |||
12 | Benjamin Gommert (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-05-01 | |||
23 | Carsten Wehlmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-06-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Wolf Muller (from 2006-08-01) (until 2006-08-31) | 1986-12-03 | ||||
2 | Dietmar Hirsch (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-12-08 | |||
3 | Rouven Schroder (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-10-18 | |||
5 | Carsten Rump (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-03-21 | |||
7 | Deniz Dogan (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-10-20 | |||
16 | Alexej Koslow (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-12-25 | |||
21 | Timo Neumann (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-05-09 | |||
22 | Ibrahim Turkmen (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-05-17 | |||
26 | Jan-Moritz Bruhn (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-03-06 | |||
28 | Dennis Wehrendt (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-02-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Rene Gradert (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-08 | ||||
Andre Kalbau (from 2006-11-19) (until 2006-11-30) | 1987-12-15 | ||||
5 | Benjamin Baltes (from 2006-08-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-03-30 | |||
8 | Bjorn Lindemann (until 2007-01-09) | 1984-01-23 | |||
10 | Thomas Ollhoff (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-06-15 | |||
13 | Artur Zimmermann (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-06-13 | |||
14 | Markus Kullig (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-11-04 | |||
17 | Abdul Karim Martens (until 2007-06-30) | 1988-11-29 | |||
18 | Jan Hoffmann (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-09-01 | |||
23 | Kevin Wolk (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-05-28 | |||
29 | Artur Schefer (from 2006-11-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-04-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Kai Konrad (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-05-13 | ||||
9 | Daniel Barwolf (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-05-13 | |||
11 | Enrico Neitzel (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-04-11 | |||
15 | Claudius Weber (from 2006-08-31) (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-04-15 | |||
16 | Dennis Kruppke (from 2007-01-29) (until 2007-06-27) | 1980-04-01 | |||
19 | Riza Karadas (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
21 | Steve Rolleder (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-02-21 | |||
25 | Kai Hesse (until 2006-08-31) | 1985-06-20 | |||
30 | Dustin Heun (from 2006-08-31) (until 2007-12-14) | 1984-04-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2006-10-24 19:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |