Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 2007-08-06) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Felix Magath (from 2007-06-13) (until 2009-06-30) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 2007-05-19) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Robert Roelofsen (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-03-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simon Jentzsch (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
21 | Patrick Platins (until 2008-01-30) | 1983-04-19 | |||
30 | Andre Lenz (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-11-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Facundo Quiroga (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-01-10 | |||
3 | Peter van der Heyden (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-07-16 | |||
4 | Alexander Madlung (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-07-11 | |||
5 | Kevin Hofland (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-06-07 | |||
15 | Hans Sarpei (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-06-28 | |||
16 | Uwe Mohrle (until 2007-08-28) | 1979-12-03 | |||
17 | Christopher Lamprecht (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-04-22 | |||
23 | Michael Stegmayer (until 2007-07-31) | 1985-01-12 | |||
25 | Karsten Fischer (until 2007-01-10) | 1984-05-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Tom van der Leegte (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-03-27 | |||
8 | Marijan Christow (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-07-29 | |||
10 | Jacek Krzynowek (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-05-15 | |||
14 | Jonathan Santana (until 2009-01-31) | 1981-10-19 | |||
18 | Cedric Makiadi (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-02-23 | |||
20 | Miroslav Karhan (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-06-21 | |||
22 | Alex (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-09-06 | |||
24 | Steve Muller (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-05-16 | |||
26 | Sergej Evljuskin (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-04 | |||
27 | Pablo Thiam (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | |||
32 | Marcelinho (from 2007-01-12) (until 2008-06-30) | 1975-05-17 | |||
33 | Julio Dos Santos (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-05-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Juan Menseguez (until 2007-08-15) | 1984-02-18 | |||
9 | Diego Klimowicz (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-07-06 | |||
11 | Mike Hanke (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-11-05 | |||
13 | Isaac Boakye (until 2008-01-03) | 1981-11-26 | |||
19 | Rick Hoogendorp (until 2007-01-31) | 1975-01-12 | |||
28 | Kamani Hill (from 2007-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-12-28 | |||
31 | Emre Ozturk (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-04-01 | |||
32 | Abuda (until 2006-08-29) | 1986-03-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2006-10-24 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-12-20 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-02-27 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2007-04-18 20:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |