Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Adam Matysek (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas von Heesen (from 2008-02-11) (until 2008-08-28) | 1961-10-01 | ||||
Hans Meyer (until 2008-02-11) | 1942-11-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Oenning (from 2008-02-12) (until 2008-08-28) | 1965-09-27 | ||||
Jurgen Raab (until 2008-02-11) | 1958-12-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Stephan (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-09-15 | |||
18 | Daniel Klewer (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-03-04 | |||
29 | Jaromir Blazek (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-12-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lars Jacobsen (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-09-20 | |||
3 | Michael Beauchamp (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-03-08 | |||
4 | Glauber (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-08-05 | |||
5 | Andreas Wolf (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-06-12 | |||
7 | Marek Nikl (until 2007-09-17) | 1976-02-20 | |||
16 | Ralf Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-10-09 | |||
23 | Matthew Spiranovic (until 2010-01-06) | 1988-06-27 | |||
25 | Javier Pinola (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-02-24 | |||
27 | Jacques Abardonado (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-08-31) | 1978-05-27 | |||
28 | Dominik Reinhardt (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-12-19 | |||
30 | Michael Kammermeyer (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-01-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Tomas Galasek (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-01-15 | |||
8 | Jan Polak (until 2007-07-31) | 1981-03-14 | |||
10 | Zvjezdan Misimovic (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-06-05 | |||
11 | Marek Mintal (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | |||
15 | Jan Kristiansen (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-08-04 | |||
21 | Dario Vidosic (until 2010-01-18) | 1987-04-08 | |||
22 | Marco Engelhardt (until 2008-12-31) | 1980-12-02 | |||
24 | Peer Kluge (until 2010-01-03) | 1980-11-22 | |||
34 | Lukas Kling (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-11-13 | |||
36 | Jaouhar Mnari (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-11-08 | |||
37 | Sebastian Szikal (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-11-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Angelos Charisteas (until 2009-01-31) | 1980-02-09 | |||
13 | Iwan Sajenko (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-10-17 | |||
14 | Petar Jelic (until 2007-08-28) | 1986-10-18 | |||
17 | Nicky Adler (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-05-23 | |||
19 | Jan Koller (from 2008-01-06) (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-03-30 | |||
20 | Joshua Kennedy (until 2008-01-10) | 1982-08-20 | |||
26 | Christoph Weber (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-08-26 | |||
32 | Leon Benko (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-11-11 | |||
33 | Robert Vittek (until 2008-08-28) | 1982-04-01 | |||
35 | Chhunly Pagenburg (until 2007-12-31) | 1986-11-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2007-08-05 14:30 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2007-10-31 19:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |