Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Hain (until 2009-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Torsten Lieberknecht (from 2008-05-13) (until 2018-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | ||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 2008-05-12) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz-Gunter Scheil (until 2008-06-30) | 1962-11-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Nico Lauenstein (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-01-12 | |||
21 | Adrian Horn (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-10-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dennis Brinkmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-11-22 | |||
3 | Sebastian Gundelach (until 2008-12-31) | 1982-09-17 | |||
4 | Matthias Henn (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-04-28 | |||
5 | Martin Horacek (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-06-21 | |||
8 | Deniz Dogan (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-10-20 | |||
14 | Jan Washausen (until 2013-01-17) | 1988-10-12 | |||
19 | Ken Reichel (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-12-19 | |||
33 | Valentin Nastase (from 2008-01-31) (until 2009-06-30) | 1974-10-04 | |||
34 | Fabian Brocker (from 2008-01-26) (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-04-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Holger Wehlage (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-07-03 | |||
7 | Benjamin Fuchs (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-10-20 | |||
10 | Mirko Boland (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-04-23 | |||
11 | Philipp Peters (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-03-16 | |||
13 | Tim Danneberg (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-04-23 | |||
15 | Ramazan Yildirim (from 2007-09-13) (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-09-07 | |||
17 | Kai Koitka (until 2008-08-21) | 1981-09-30 | |||
22 | Christian Lenze (from 2007-08-08) (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-04-26 | |||
24 | Kosta Rodrigues (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-08-12 | |||
31 | Marc Pfitzner (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-08-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Torsten Oehrl (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-01-07 | |||
10 | Andre Schembri (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-05-27 | |||
18 | Lars Fuchs (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-06-21 | |||
20 | Stefan Hauk (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-01-27 | |||
23 | Sreto Ristic (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-02-07 | |||
32 | Dennis Kruppke (from 2008-01-04) (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-04-01 | |||
35 | Domi Kumbela (from 2008-02-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-04-20 | |||
36 | Zoran Ratkovic (until 2007-12-31) | 1978-12-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2007-08-04 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |