Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Menger (until 2011-06-30) | 1972-09-11 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 2009-06-30) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Armin Reutershahn (until 2009-06-30) | 1960-03-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oka Nikolov (until 2013-06-30) | 1974-05-25 | |||
21 | Markus Proll (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-08-28 | |||
28 | Jan Zimmermann (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Patrick Ochs (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
3 | Aaron Galindo (from 2007-07-28) (until 2009-01-07) | 1982-05-08 | |||
5 | Aleksandar Vasoski (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-11-21 | |||
16 | Christoph Spycher (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-03-30 | |||
23 | Marco Russ (until 2011-07-15) | 1985-08-04 | |||
27 | Sotirios Kyrgiakos (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-07-23 | |||
29 | Chris (until 2011-08-30) | 1978-08-25 | |||
31 | Mounir Chaftar (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-01-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Christoph Preuss (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-07-04 | |||
6 | Michael Fink (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-02-01 | |||
7 | Benjamin Kohler (until 2013-01-17) | 1980-08-04 | |||
8 | Albert Streit (until 2007-12-31) | 1980-03-28 | |||
10 | Markus Weissenberger (until 2008-06-30) | 1975-03-08 | |||
15 | Mehdi Mahdavikia (until 2010-01-25) | 1977-07-24 | |||
20 | Junichi Inamoto (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-09-18 | |||
22 | Kreso Ljubicic (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-26 | |||
30 | Caio (from 2008-01-16) (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-05-29 | |||
32 | Faton Toski (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-02-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Evanggelos Mantzios (from 2008-01-30) (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-04-22 | |||
9 | Marcel Heller (until 2008-08-27) | 1986-02-12 | |||
11 | Michael Thurk (until 2008-01-04) | 1976-05-28 | |||
14 | Alexander Meier (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-01-17 | |||
17 | Martin Fenin (from 2008-01-01) (until 2011-08-30) | 1987-04-16 | |||
18 | Ioannis Amanatidis (until 2011-07-18) | 1981-12-03 | |||
19 | Naohiro Takahara (until 2008-01-03) | 1979-06-04 | |||
24 | Martin Hess (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-02-06 | |||
26 | Juvhel Tsoumou (from 2007-11-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-12-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2007-08-05 14:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2007-10-31 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |