Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Klaus-Peter Nemet (until 2011-06-30) | 1953-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Holger Stanislawski (until 2011-06-30) | 1969-09-26 | ||||
Andre Trulsen (until 2008-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patrik Borger (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-01-19 | |||
31 | Benedikt Pliquett (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-12-20 | |||
32 | Timo Reus (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-05-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Florian Lechner (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-03-03 | |||
3 | Pavlo Yanchuk (from 2008-01-30) (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-07-12 | |||
3 | Ian Joy (until 2008-01-16) | 1981-07-14 | |||
4 | Fabio Morena (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-19 | |||
11 | Ralph Gunesch (until 2012-01-30) | 1983-09-02 | |||
14 | Marcel Eger (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-03-23 | |||
15 | Abdou Sall (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-11-01 | |||
19 | Tim Petersen (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-03-03 | |||
22 | Andreas Biermann (from 2008-01-30) (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-09-13 | |||
24 | Carsten Rothenbach (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | |||
27 | Jan-Philipp Kalla (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-08-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Bjorn Brunnemann (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
6 | Filip Trojan (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-02-21 | |||
8 | Florian Bruns (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-08-21 | |||
10 | Thomas Meggle (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-02-22 | |||
12 | Timo Schultz (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | |||
13 | Charles Takyi (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-11-12 | |||
17 | Fabian Boll (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-06-16 | |||
18 | Alexander Ludwig (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-01-31 | |||
20 | Jonathan Bourgault (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
22 | Jerry Karikari (until 2008-01-28) | 1987-07-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Marvin Braun (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-01-11 | |||
9 | Rene Schnitzler (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-04-14 | |||
16 | Roman Prokoph (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-08-06 | |||
23 | Ahmet Kuru (until 2008-07-13) | 1982-04-23 | |||
26 | Morike Sako (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-11-17 | |||
28 | Omer Sismanoglu (from 2007-12-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-08-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2007-08-04 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-10-30 19:00 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |