Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Sievers (until 2014-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (until 2009-08-19) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Bremser (until 2010-01-31) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Robert Enke (until 2009-11-10) | 1977-08-24 | |||
20 | Richard Golz (until 2008-06-30) | 1968-06-05 | |||
25 | Frank Juric (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-10-28 | |||
30 | Morten Jensen (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-09-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Dariusz Zuraw (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-11-14 | |||
4 | Valerien Ismael (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1975-09-28 | |||
5 | Thomas Kleine (until 2008-01-26) | 1977-12-28 | |||
6 | Steven Cherundolo (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
18 | Michael Tarnat (until 2009-06-30) | 1969-10-27 | |||
19 | Christian Schulz (from 2007-08-30) (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-04-01 | |||
22 | Frank Fahrenhorst (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-09-24 | |||
32 | Moritz Marheineke (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | |||
35 | Soren Halfar (until 2007-08-28) | 1987-01-02 | |||
40 | Vinicius (until 2009-04-30) | 1980-07-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Sergio da Silva Pinto (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-16 | |||
8 | Altin Lala (until 2012-06-30) | 1975-11-18 | |||
10 | Arnold Bruggink (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-07-24 | |||
11 | Szabolcs Huszti (until 2009-01-31) | 1983-04-18 | |||
14 | Hanno Balitsch (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-01-02 | |||
15 | Sal Zizzo (from 2007-07-25) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-04-03 | |||
17 | Gaetan Krebs (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
23 | Tschawdar Jankow (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-03-29 | |||
26 | Jan Rosenthal (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-04-07 | |||
27 | Silvio Schroter (until 2008-01-23) | 1979-06-29 | |||
28 | Hendrik Hahne (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-04-15 | |||
33 | Ferhat Bikmaz (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-07-06 | |||
34 | Konstantin Rausch (from 2008-03-29) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-03-15 | |||
35 | Bastian Schulz (from 2008-03-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-07-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
13 | Thomas Brdaric (until 2008-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
16 | Vahid Hashemian (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-07-21 | |||
19 | Gunnar Thorvaldsson (until 2007-08-29) | 1982-04-01 | |||
21 | Benjamin Lauth (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-08-04 | |||
24 | Jiri Stajner (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-05-27 | |||
29 | Mike Hanke (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-11-05 | |||
31 | Fabian Montabell (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-02-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2007-08-04 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-10-30 19:00 |
2 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |