Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Ferenc Rott (until 2009-06-30) | 1970-10-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (until 2009-04-20) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bastian Becker (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-06-21 | |||
21 | Jorg Staniczek (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-11-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Michael Bodnar (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-01-02 | |||
4 | Christoph Stahl (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-08-09 | |||
5 | Krisztian Szollar (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-08-30 | |||
15 | Daniel Rasch (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-04-06 | |||
17 | Ahmet Sahinler (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-04-12 | |||
18 | Christian Wiesner (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-09-22 | |||
19 | Christian Eckerlin (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-11-16 | |||
22 | Pascal Pellowski (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-12-18 | |||
33 | Christian Remmers (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-02-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tim Heyse (from 2008-05-30) (until 2008-06-30) | |||||
Gokhan Oztas (from 2008-05-24) (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-01-31 | ||||
2 | Abdelkader Jellouli (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-06-24 | |||
2 | Silas Rauschmayr (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-05-25 | |||
6 | Davide Faga (until 2008-12-31) | 1987-11-24 | |||
7 | Sebastian Hess (until 2008-12-31) | 1987-10-21 | |||
10 | Michael Anicic (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-10-18 | |||
11 | Nikola Jovanovic (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-11-19 | |||
16 | Simon Schmidt (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-01-14 | |||
20 | Alvano Kroh (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-07-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Patrizio Colucci (from 2008-05-30) (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-10-17 | ||||
8 | Sebastian Glasner (until 2008-07-27) | 1985-05-06 | |||
9 | Fabio Eidelwein (until 2008-12-31) | 1975-06-13 | |||
13 | Elia Soriano (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-06-26 | |||
14 | Rudi Hubner (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-06-15 | |||
17 | Christopher Nguyen (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-01-13 | |||
23 | Faouzi Atmani (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-11-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2007-08-05 17:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |