Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Steffen Vogler (until 2014-06-30) | 1966-06-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christian Hock (from 2007-08-21) (until 2008-12-17) | 1970-04-11 | ||||
Durad Vasic (from 2007-07-02) (until 2007-08-20) | 1956-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Adnan Masic (until 2008-06-30) | 1975-05-19 | |||
20 | Florian Stahl (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-10-20 | |||
35 | Thomas Richter (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-08-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Ales Kokot (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-10-23 | |||
3 | Robert Paul (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-10-17 | |||
4 | Dajan Simac (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-01-04 | |||
5 | Marko Kopilas (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-07-22 | |||
14 | Nikolaos Nakas (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-04-13 | |||
15 | Benjamin Schockel (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-08-16 | |||
16 | Kristjan Glibo (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-04-01 | |||
18 | Vlado Jeknic (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-08-14 | |||
26 | Torge Hollmann (until 2010-07-15) | 1982-01-28 | |||
28 | Benjamin Hubner (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-07-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Daniel Damm (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-12-02 | |||
7 | Enis Alushi (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-12-22 | |||
8 | Sandro Schwarz (until 2009-03-23) | 1978-10-17 | |||
10 | Hajrudin Catic (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-03-23 | |||
11 | Benjamin Siegert (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-07-07 | |||
17 | Torsten Reuter (until 2007-08-27) | 1982-09-15 | |||
21 | Jonas Gruter (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-02-01 | |||
22 | Sascha Amstatter (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-11-08 | |||
24 | Maximilian Nicu (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-11-25 | |||
29 | Olivier Caillas (until 2008-01-22) | 1977-12-02 | |||
30 | Patrick Bick (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-03-12 | |||
36 | Carl Lombe (until 2007-12-31) | 1986-05-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Dennis Schmidt (from 2008-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-04-18 | |||
13 | Ronny Konig (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-06-02 | |||
19 | Rodrigo Teixeira (until 2007-12-19) | 1978-06-16 | |||
23 | Abdelaziz Ahanfouf (from 2008-01-18) (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-01-14 | |||
23 | Martin Willmann (until 2007-12-31) | 1979-11-01 | |||
25 | Bakary Diakite (until 2009-08-02) | 1980-11-09 | |||
27 | Aykut Ozturk (from 2008-05-17) (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-11-07 | |||
27 | Valentine Atem (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-08-26 | |||
33 | Hui Xie (from 2008-01-01) (until 2009-01-06) | 1975-02-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2007-08-04 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |