Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Jurgen (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-09-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Wolter (until 2013-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Bender (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-07-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Sebastian Mielitz (from 2007-11-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-07-18 | ||||
1 | Nico Pellatz (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-07-08 | |||
20 | Michael Jurgen (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-09-12 | |||
26 | Kevin Fickentscher (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-07-06 | |||
30 | Robbert te Loeke (from 2007-08-23) (until 2007-12-31) | 1988-12-01 | |||
33 | Christian Vander (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-10-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Owomoyela (from 2008-01-29) (until 2008-01-30) | 1979-11-05 | ||||
3 | Alparslan Erdem (until 2008-07-31) | 1988-12-11 | |||
4 | Florian Mohr (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-08-25 | |||
5 | Toni Gange (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-01-27 | |||
5 | Bjorn Schierenbeck (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-07-12 | |||
14 | Sandro Stallbaum (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-09-14 | |||
16 | Alexander Hessel (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-05-26 | |||
19 | Marin Mandic (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-08-11 | |||
23 | Robert Lohmeier (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-07-28 | |||
27 | Daniel Halke (until 2007-12-31) | 1987-03-03 | |||
28 | Dominik Schmidt (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-07-01 | |||
29 | Francis Banecki (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-07-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peter Niemeyer (until 2008-12-31) | 1983-11-22 | ||||
Stefan Ronneburg (from 2008-01-29) (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-02-07 | ||||
2 | Finn Holsing (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-08-09 | |||
4 | Dennis Diekmeier (from 2008-02-01) (until 2009-01-07) | 1989-10-20 | |||
6 | Dominic Peitz (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-09-11 | |||
10 | Max Kruse (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-03-19 | |||
13 | Kevin Artmann (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-04-21 | |||
15 | Amaury Bischoff (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-03-31 | |||
17 | Philipp Bargfrede (from 2008-04-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-03-03 | |||
17 | Kevin Schindler (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
21 | Stefan Ronneburg (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-02-07 | |||
21 | Norman Theuerkauf (until 2007-12-31) | 1987-01-24 | |||
22 | Julian Grundt (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-06-21 | |||
24 | Thomas Johrden (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-03-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Alexander Neumann (from 2007-08-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-08-13 | ||||
Andreas Granskov (from 2007-08-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-03-05 | ||||
7 | Martin Harnik (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-06-10 | |||
8 | Marc Heider (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-05-18 | |||
9 | Kenny Schmidt (until 2007-12-19) | 1987-05-26 | |||
11 | Frank Loning (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-08-28 | |||
17 | Ivan Klasnic (from 2007-10-29) (until 2007-11-06) | 1980-01-29 | |||
18 | Patrick Barje (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-03-04 | |||
25 | Mirko Jankowski (until 2008-01-20) | 1988-01-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2007-08-05 14:30 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-10-30 19:00 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2008-01-30 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |