Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dr. Philipp Laux (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-01-25 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Rangnick (until 2010-12-31) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Zeidler (from 2008-01-14) (until 2010-12-31) | 1962-08-08 | ||||
Tomislav Maric (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | ||||
Achim Sarstedt (until 2009-06-30) | 1959-10-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Haas (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
27 | Ramazan Ozcan (from 2008-01-08) (until 2009-12-31) | 1984-06-28 | |||
30 | Thorsten Kirschbaum (until 2009-01-09) | 1987-04-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Mario Gottlicher (until 2007-08-07) | 1982-08-05 | |||
3 | Matthias Jaissle (until 2014-02-13) | 1988-04-05 | |||
5 | Marvin Compper (from 2008-01-11) (until 2013-01-24) | 1985-06-14 | |||
5 | Marcel Throm (until 2007-12-31) | 1979-04-21 | |||
6 | Michael Rundio (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-01-21 | |||
12 | Denis Bindnagel (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-06-05 | |||
14 | Christoph Janker (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-02-14 | |||
24 | Per Nilsson (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-09-15 | |||
26 | Andreas Ibertsberger (from 2008-01-30) (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-07-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Steffen Haas (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-03-18 | |||
7 | Dragan Paljic (until 2008-08-18) | 1983-04-08 | |||
8 | Andreas Mayer (until 2008-01-03) | 1980-12-15 | |||
10 | Selim Teber (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-03-07 | |||
11 | Jochen Seitz (until 2009-01-06) | 1976-10-11 | |||
13 | Zsolt Low (until 2009-01-25) | 1979-04-29 | |||
15 | Radek Spilacek (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-01-10 | |||
16 | Matthias Keller (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-11-20 | |||
17 | Tobias Weis (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-07-30 | |||
21 | Luiz Gustavo (from 2007-08-31) (until 2010-12-31) | 1987-07-23 | |||
23 | Sejad Salihovic (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-10-08 | |||
25 | Isaac Vorsah (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-06-21 | |||
33 | Carlos Eduardo (from 2007-08-29) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-07-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Tomislav Maric (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | |||
18 | Kai Hesse (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-06-20 | |||
19 | Vedad Ibisevic (until 2012-01-24) | 1984-08-06 | |||
20 | Chinedu Obasi (from 2007-08-25) (until 2011-12-31) | 1986-06-01 | |||
20 | Mirnes Mesic (until 2007-08-30) | 1978-03-16 | |||
22 | Francisco Copado (until 2008-12-16) | 1974-07-19 | |||
29 | Demba Ba (from 2007-08-29) (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-05-25 | |||
32 | Kai Herdling (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-06-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2007-08-03 19:00 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-10-30 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-01-29 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-02-26 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |