Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jurgen Wittmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1966-08-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Marco Kurz (until 2009-02-23) | 1969-05-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunther Gorenzel-Simonitsch (until 2008-08-31) | 1971-10-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Hofmann (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
12 | Philipp Tschauner (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-11-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Gabriel Santos (from 2007-07-19) (until 2007-08-04) | 1983-03-05 | ||||
3 | Marcel Schafer (until 2007-07-22) | 1984-06-07 | |||
4 | Torben Hoffmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-10-27 | |||
5 | Gregg Berhalter (until 2009-03-31) | 1973-08-01 | |||
14 | Jose Holebas (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-06-27 | |||
16 | Markus Thorandt (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-04-01 | |||
19 | Mate Ghwinianidse (until 2011-02-09) | 1986-12-10 | |||
20 | Christoph Burkhard (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-11-09 | |||
23 | Benjamin Schwarz (until 2010-01-10) | 1986-07-10 | |||
26 | Julian Baumgartlinger (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | |||
28 | Alexander Eberlein (until 2008-12-31) | 1988-01-14 | |||
30 | Lukas Szukala (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-05-26 | |||
33 | Fabian Johnson (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-12-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Daniel Bierofka (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-02-07 | |||
8 | Danny Schwarz (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-05-11 | |||
17 | Sven Bender (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
18 | Timo Gebhart (until 2008-12-31) | 1989-04-12 | |||
22 | Lars Bender (until 2009-08-17) | 1989-04-27 | |||
25 | Nikolas Ledgerwood (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
27 | Bjorn Ziegenbein (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-04-30 | |||
32 | Manuel Duhnke (from 2007-12-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-08-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Antonio Di Salvo (until 2010-01-11) | 1979-06-05 | |||
10 | Berkant Goktan (until 2008-10-21) | 1980-12-12 | |||
11 | Josh Wolff (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-02-25 | |||
13 | Chhunly Pagenburg (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-11-10 | |||
21 | Markus Schroth (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-01-25 | |||
24 | Mustafa Kucukovic (from 2007-08-21) (until 2009-01-31) | 1986-11-05 | |||
35 | Manuel Schaffler (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1989-02-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2007-08-04 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-10-30 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-01-29 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2008-02-27 20:30 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |