Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Frank (from 2008-02-06) (until 2008-06-30) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Wolfgang Jerat (until 2008-02-05) | 1955-02-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Joachim Hopp (until 2008-06-30) | 1966-07-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Christian Maly (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-01-20 | |||
12 | Sascha Samulewicz (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-03-21 | |||
43 | Sebastian Volzow (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-02-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andy Habl (from 2008-05-23) (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-08-04 | ||||
Sebastian Michalsky (from 2007-11-10) (until 2007-11-11) | 1983-11-25 | ||||
2 | Thomas Litjens (until 2007-08-14) | 1984-08-22 | |||
3 | Marco Neppe (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-06-14 | |||
6 | Michael Stuckmann (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-09-01 | |||
11 | Victor Lorenzon (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-05-22 | |||
19 | Daniel Voigt (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-11-04 | |||
20 | Andre Wiwerink (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-10-15 | |||
25 | Andreas Kohlhaas (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-03-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Tim Jerat (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-03-05 | |||
5 | Lucas Oppermann (until 2008-02-20) | 1986-08-28 | |||
7 | Sven Lintjens (until 2008-01-30) | 1976-10-05 | |||
8 | Manuel Bolstler (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-04-26 | |||
10 | Mike Rietpietsch (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-03-26 | |||
14 | Dustin Hahner (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-01-12 | |||
17 | Jan Hammes (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-02-02 | |||
21 | Huzeyfe Dogan (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
22 | Michael Lejan (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-05-02 | |||
23 | Fatlum Zaskoku (from 2008-04-11) (until 2008-12-31) | 1987-09-30 | |||
30 | Jean Louis Tavarez (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-04-04 | |||
33 | Dennis Malura (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-06-20 | |||
34 | Salih Altin (until 2007-12-31) | 1987-07-17 | |||
42 | Ferhat Uelker (from 2007-10-26) (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-06-22 | |||
44 | Marc Narewsky (from 2008-01-09) (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-07-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
2 | Dennis Schulp (from 2008-01-07) (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-01-18 | |||
9 | Mahir Saglik (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-01-18 | |||
11 | Marcel Reichwein (until 2007-08-22) | 1986-02-21 | |||
16 | Bulut Aksoy (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-10-25 | |||
18 | Tobias Damm (from 2007-08-11) (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-10-30 | |||
23 | Dirk Heinzmann (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-10-20 | |||
36 | Freddy Mombongo (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-08-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2007-08-05 14:00 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-10-30 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-01-29 19:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |