Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Holger Gehrke (until 2009-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (until 2009-05-31) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Roland Koch (until 2009-06-30) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Faryd Mondragon (until 2010-12-31) | 1971-06-21 | |||
18 | Thomas Kessler (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-01-20 | |||
32 | Dieter Paucken (until 2008-09-17) | 1982-09-20 | |||
34 | Miro Varvodic (from 2008-08-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-05-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Miso Brecko (until 2015-07-30) | 1984-05-01 | |||
3 | Youssef Mohamad (until 2011-08-18) | 1980-07-01 | |||
4 | Marvin Matip (until 2010-01-31) | 1985-09-25 | |||
5 | Umit Ozat (until 2009-03-14) | 1976-10-30 | |||
6 | Pierre Wome (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-03-26 | |||
15 | Tobias Nickenig (until 2009-01-12) | 1984-08-01 | |||
21 | Geromel (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-09-21 | |||
23 | Kevin McKenna (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-01-21 | |||
25 | Kevin Schoneberg (until 2009-01-26) | 1985-08-24 | |||
26 | Aleksandar Mitreski (until 2008-08-31) | 1980-08-05 | |||
28 | Carsten Cullmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1976-03-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
10 | Thomas Broich (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-01-29 | |||
12 | Petit (from 2008-07-28) (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-09-25 | |||
13 | Daniel Brosinski (until 2011-01-08) | 1988-07-17 | |||
14 | Wilfried Sanou (until 2010-01-24) | 1984-03-16 | |||
16 | Andre Oliveira (from 2009-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-04-20 | |||
16 | Andre Oliveira (until 2008-08-26) | 1985-04-20 | |||
17 | Kevin Pezzoni (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-03-22 | |||
19 | Adil Chihi (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-02-21 | |||
20 | Roda Antar (until 2009-03-12) | 1980-09-12 | |||
22 | Fabrice Ehret (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-09-28 | |||
26 | Derek Boateng (from 2009-01-05) (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-05-02 | |||
27 | Michael Parensen (until 2009-01-27) | 1986-06-24 | |||
28 | Michael Niedrig (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-01-12 | |||
29 | Taner Yalcin (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-02-18 | |||
30 | Michael Gardawski (until 2010-01-30) | 1990-09-25 | |||
45 | Adam Matuschyk (from 2009-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Nemanja Vucicevic (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-08-11 | |||
8 | Matthias Scherz (until 2009-06-30) | 1971-12-14 | |||
9 | Manasseh Ishiaku (until 2011-01-30) | 1983-01-09 | |||
11 | Milivoje Novakovic (until 2012-08-01) | 1979-05-18 | |||
24 | Sergiu Radu (from 2008-08-08) (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-08-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2008-08-07 20:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-09-23 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |