Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Menger (until 2011-06-30) | 1972-09-11 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 2009-06-30) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Armin Reutershahn (until 2009-06-30) | 1960-03-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oka Nikolov (until 2013-06-30) | 1974-05-25 | |||
21 | Markus Proll (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-08-28 | |||
28 | Jan Zimmermann (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Patrick Ochs (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
3 | Nikola Petkovic (from 2009-01-22) (until 2010-08-20) | 1986-03-28 | |||
3 | Aaron Galindo (until 2009-01-07) | 1982-05-08 | |||
5 | Aleksandar Vasoski (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-11-21 | |||
16 | Christoph Spycher (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-03-30 | |||
19 | Habib Bellaid (until 2009-08-30) | 1986-03-28 | |||
23 | Marco Russ (until 2011-07-15) | 1985-08-04 | |||
27 | Alexander Krük (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-01-21 | |||
29 | Chris (until 2011-08-30) | 1978-08-25 | |||
33 | Jurgen Mossmer (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-06-11 | |||
38 | Sebastian Jung (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-06-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Christoph Preuss (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-07-04 | |||
6 | Michael Fink (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-02-01 | |||
7 | Benjamin Kohler (until 2013-01-17) | 1980-08-04 | |||
8 | Zlatan Bajramovic (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-08-12 | |||
11 | Umit Korkmaz (until 2011-01-24) | 1985-09-17 | |||
13 | Markus Steinhofer (until 2009-12-31) | 1986-03-07 | |||
15 | Mehdi Mahdavikia (until 2010-01-25) | 1977-07-24 | |||
20 | Junichi Inamoto (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-09-18 | |||
22 | Kreso Ljubicic (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-26 | |||
30 | Caio (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-05-29 | |||
32 | Faton Toski (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-02-17 | |||
35 | Norman Theuerkauf (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-01-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Leonard Kweuke (from 2009-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-07-12 | |||
9 | Marcel Heller (until 2008-08-27) | 1986-02-12 | |||
10 | Nikos Liberopoulos (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-08-04 | |||
14 | Alexander Meier (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-01-17 | |||
17 | Martin Fenin (until 2011-08-30) | 1987-04-16 | |||
18 | Ioannis Amanatidis (until 2011-07-18) | 1981-12-03 | |||
26 | Juvhel Tsoumou (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-12-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2008-08-09 19:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-09-23 19:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |