Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Antonio Ananijew (until 2010-06-30) | 1965-05-08 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Bojan Prasnikar (until 2009-06-30) | 1953-02-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Guido Hoffmann (until 2009-06-30) | 1965-12-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gerhard Tremmel (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
23 | Tomislav Piplica (until 2009-06-30) | 1969-04-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Thomas Franke (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-21 | |||
6 | Vragel da Silva (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-03-29 | |||
15 | Alexander Bittroff (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-09-19 | |||
17 | Daniel Ziebig (until 2012-12-31) | 1983-01-21 | |||
18 | Lukasz Kanik (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-02-26 | |||
21 | Savo Pavicevic (until 2009-08-19) | 1980-12-11 | |||
24 | Igor Mitreski (until 2009-01-09) | 1979-02-19 | |||
25 | Jan Rajnoch (from 2009-01-07) (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-09-30 | |||
27 | Ovidiu Burca (from 2009-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-03-16 | |||
28 | Ivan Radeljic (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-09-14 | |||
33 | Mario Cvitanovic (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-05-06 | |||
35 | Cagdas Atan (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-02-29 | |||
36 | Peter Hackenberg (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Christian Bassila (until 2008-08-31) | 1977-10-05 | |||
4 | Stanislaw Angelow (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-04-12 | |||
5 | Mariusz Kukielka (until 2009-08-26) | 1976-11-07 | |||
7 | Timo Rost (until 2009-12-09) | 1978-08-29 | |||
10 | Stiven Rivic (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-08-09 | |||
13 | Ervin Skela (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-11-17 | |||
14 | Dusan Vasiljevic (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-05-07 | |||
16 | Marco Kurth (until 2012-01-30) | 1978-08-18 | |||
20 | Jiayi Shao (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-04-10 | |||
29 | Dennis Sorensen (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-05-24 | |||
31 | Michael Lerchl (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-08-09 | |||
37 | Christian Muller (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-02-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Franklin Bittencourt (until 2009-06-30) | 1969-02-24 | ||||
8 | Dimitar Rangelow (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-02-09 | |||
9 | Emil Jula (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-01-03 | |||
11 | Ivica Iliev (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-10-27 | |||
19 | Marc-Philipp Zimmermann (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-03-22 | |||
22 | Danny Galm (until 2009-01-31) | 1986-03-17 | |||
26 | Nils Petersen (from 2009-01-05) (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-12-06 | |||
30 | Branko Jelic (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-05-05 | |||
32 | Adi (from 2009-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-12-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2008-08-09 19:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-09-23 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2009-01-28 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |