Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Zdenko Miletic (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jos Luhukay (from 2009-04-14) (until 2012-06-30) | 1963-06-13 | ||||
Holger Fach (until 2009-04-13) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Gellhaus (from 2009-04-14) (until 2012-06-30) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Sascha Franz (until 2009-06-30) | 1974-01-16 | ||||
Dariusz Pasieka (until 2009-04-13) | 1965-08-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patrick Lehner (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-03-21 | |||
24 | Lukas Kruse (from 2009-02-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-07-09 | |||
30 | Sven Neuhaus (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-04-04 | |||
55 | Wassili Chomutowski (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-08-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Vaclav Drobny (until 2008-07-21) | 1980-09-09 | |||
3 | Otar Chisaneischwili (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-09-26 | |||
4 | Benjamin Kern (until 2009-12-30) | 1983-11-05 | |||
5 | Ingo Hertzsch (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-07-22 | |||
6 | Thomas Klasener (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-08-14 | |||
13 | Patrick Pircher (until 2008-08-29) | 1982-04-07 | |||
15 | Mark Prettenthaler (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-04-11 | |||
16 | Uwe Mohrle (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
21 | Roland Benschneider (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-08-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Jens Hegeler (from 2009-01-07) (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
7 | Daniel Baier (from 2008-09-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-05-18 | |||
10 | Elton da Costa (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-12-15 | |||
13 | Tobias Werner (until 2016-08-02) | 1985-07-19 | |||
17 | Lars Muller (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-03-22 | |||
18 | Mourad Hdiouad (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-09-10 | |||
20 | Christian Muller (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-08-13 | |||
22 | Patrick Molzl (until 2009-12-31) | 1980-12-28 | |||
23 | Andrew Sinkala (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-06-18 | |||
28 | Robert Strauss (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-10-07 | |||
35 | Dino Toppmoller (from 2008-09-08) (until 2009-04-07) | 1980-11-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Momo Diabang (until 2008-07-22) | 1979-01-21 | |||
8 | Francis Kioyo (from 2008-09-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-09-18 | |||
8 | Froylan Ledezma (until 2008-08-18) | 1978-01-02 | |||
9 | Imre Szabics (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-03-22 | |||
11 | Marco Vorbeck (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-06-24 | |||
14 | Sandor Torghelle (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-05-05 | |||
19 | Marco Kuntzel (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-01-22 | |||
27 | Michael Thurk (until 2012-01-01) | 1976-05-28 | |||
32 | Anton Makarenko (until 2009-01-22) | 1988-08-22 | |||
36 | Stephan Hain (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-09-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2008-08-09 19:30 |
1 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-09-23 20:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |