Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Mohammed Amiq (from 2009-03-18) (until 2009-09-30) | 1949-07-07 | ||||
Werner Bohm (from 2009-01-21) (until 2009-03-17) | |||||
Wolfgang Sidka (from 2008-11-15) (until 2009-01-20) | 1954-05-26 | ||||
Mike Barten (until 2008-11-20) | 1973-11-20 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Werner Bohm (until 2009-01-20) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Mansur Faqiryar (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-01-03 | |||
31 | Dominik Schutz (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-02-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Dario Fossi (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-05-21 | |||
17 | Frederik Loffler (until 2009-06-30) | ||||
26 | Nils Laabs (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-02-29 | |||
27 | Sedat Yucel (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-01-28 | |||
29 | Patrick Mouaya (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-07-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Seyed Nekoonejad (until 2009-06-30) | |||||
Marius Winkelmann (from 2009-04-25) (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-11-21 | ||||
Mike Barten (until 2008-11-20) | 1973-11-20 | ||||
2 | Viktor Pekrul (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-12-19 | |||
5 | Daniel Isailovic (from 2008-10-15) (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-07-12 | |||
5 | Hyun-Chang Lee (until 2008-12-31) | 1985-11-02 | |||
6 | Steffen Puttkammer (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-30 | |||
8 | Wojciech Bobrowski (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-12-20 | |||
13 | Fabrizio Muzzicato (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-04-03 | |||
14 | Joel Kiki (from 2008-09-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-10-21 | |||
15 | Thomas Goktas (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-03-13 | |||
20 | Yusuf Adewunmi (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-11-05 | |||
22 | Danny Cornelius (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-04-13 | |||
28 | Benedetto Muzzicato (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-09-27 | |||
30 | Jorn Wemmer (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-05-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Gael Njeukam (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-07-07 | ||||
7 | Florent Aziri (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-03 | |||
9 | Omer Aktas (until 2008-12-31) | 1985-01-21 | |||
11 | Francky Sembolo (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-08-09 | |||
23 | Florian Otto (until 2009-06-30) | ||||
24 | Erkan Kilicaslan (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-04-05 | |||
25 | Mike Behrens (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-03-23 | |||
28 | Cesar M'Boma (until 2008-08-31) | 1979-02-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2008-08-10 16:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2008-09-24 19:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |