Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Oliver Reck (until 2009-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Mike Buskens (from 2009-03-27) (until 2009-06-30) | 1968-03-19 | ||||
Fred Rutten (until 2009-03-26) | 1962-12-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Youri Mulder (until 2009-06-30) | 1969-03-23 | ||||
Mike Buskens (until 2009-03-26) | 1968-03-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Manuel Neuer (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-03-27 | |||
32 | Ralf Fahrmann (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
33 | Mathias Schober (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-04-08 | |||
35 | Mohamed Amsif (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Heiko Westermann (until 2010-07-19) | 1983-08-14 | |||
5 | Bordon (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-01-07 | |||
18 | Rafinha (until 2010-08-03) | 1985-09-07 | |||
20 | Mladen Krstajic (until 2009-06-30) | 1974-03-04 | |||
23 | Benedikt Howedes (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-02-29 | |||
24 | Christian Pander (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-08-28 | |||
25 | Carlos Zambrano (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-07-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Lewan Kobiaschwili (until 2009-12-31) | 1977-07-10 | |||
6 | Albert Streit (until 2009-01-31) | 1980-03-28 | |||
7 | Gustavo Varela (until 2008-12-31) | 1978-05-14 | |||
8 | Fabian Ernst (until 2009-01-31) | 1979-05-30 | |||
10 | Ivan Rakitic (until 2011-01-27) | 1988-03-10 | |||
13 | Jermaine Jones (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-11-03 | |||
15 | Jose Roberto (until 2009-01-13) | 1980-12-09 | |||
17 | Jefferson Farfan (until 2015-08-14) | 1984-10-26 | |||
21 | Carlos Grossmuller (until 2009-08-27) | 1983-05-04 | |||
26 | Danny Latza (from 2009-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-12-07 | |||
28 | Markus Heppke (until 2008-12-31) | 1986-04-11 | |||
30 | Lewan Qenia (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-10-18 | |||
37 | Orlando Engelaar (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-08-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Peter Lovenkrands (until 2009-01-07) | 1980-01-29 | |||
14 | Gerald Asamoah (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
19 | Halil Altintop (until 2010-01-27) | 1982-12-08 | |||
22 | Kevin Kuranyi (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-03-02 | |||
27 | Vicente Sanchez (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-12-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2008-08-09 19:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-09-23 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-01-27 19:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-03-03 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |