Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sven Kohler (until 2015-08-30) | 1966-02-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Strozniak (until 2014-06-30) | 1955-01-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Christian Person (from 2009-02-16) (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-12-26 | ||||
1 | Norbert Guth (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-04-05 | |||
13 | Darko Horvat (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-05-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Jan Benes (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-10-24 | |||
3 | Alexander Groger (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-04-25 | |||
5 | Jens Werner (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-03-01 | |||
7 | Thorsten Gorke (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-09-22 | |||
15 | Christian Kamalla (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-03-17 | |||
16 | Adli Lachheb (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-06-22 | |||
17 | Nico Kanitz (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-05-13 | |||
18 | Robert Stark (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-11-06 | |||
19 | David Bergner (until 2010-06-30) | 1973-12-02 | |||
26 | Markus Krug (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Fabian Schossler (until 2009-07-31) | 1989-10-18 | ||||
4 | Steve Finke (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-11-24 | |||
6 | Kevin Kittler (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-12-24 | |||
8 | Maik Kunze (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-03-08 | |||
11 | Rene Stark (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-08-12 | |||
14 | Philip Schubert (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-01-10 | |||
21 | Benedikt Seipel (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-06-12 | |||
22 | Marco Hartmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-02-25 | |||
24 | Ronny Hebestreit (until 2011-06-30) | 1975-01-09 | |||
27 | Pavel David (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-10-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Toni Lindenhahn (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-11-15 | ||||
9 | Thomas Neubert (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-11-14 | |||
10 | Chwitscha Schubitidse (until 2008-08-29) | 1974-08-31 | |||
20 | Milan Janecek (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-08-26 | |||
23 | Christian Beck (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-03-10 | |||
28 | Markus Muller (from 2009-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-05-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2008-08-09 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |