Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Thorsten Albustin (until 2009-06-30) | 1974-01-04 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Aussem (from 2009-05-07) (until 2009-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Ernst Middendorp (from 2009-04-07) (until 2009-05-06) | 1958-10-28 | ||||
Michael Kulm (until 2009-04-01) | 1965-11-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ralf Aussem (until 2009-05-06) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Robin Himmelmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-02-05 | |||
20 | Andre Maczkowiak (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-04-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Caspers (from 2009-04-18) (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-05-31 | ||||
2 | Arda Yavuz (until 2008-12-31) | 1989-05-04 | |||
3 | Adnan Karabas (until 2009-06-30) | 1989-05-22 | |||
4 | David Czyszczon (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-09-04 | |||
5 | Stefan Lorenz (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-09-19 | |||
6 | Kai von der Gathen (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-04-29 | |||
50 | Sebastian Zinke (from 2009-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Markus Neumayr (from 2009-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-03-26 | |||
7 | Jozef Kotula (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-09-25 | |||
8 | Dennis Buhrer (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-03-13 | |||
10 | Bora Karadag (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-05-17 | |||
13 | Mike Wunderlich (from 2009-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-03-25 | |||
14 | Turgul Aydin (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-12-23 | |||
15 | Krisha Penn (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-04-10 | |||
17 | Robert Mainka (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-08-03 | |||
19 | Stefan Kuhne (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-08-15 | |||
21 | Michael Lorenz (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-01-11 | |||
23 | Tayfun Cagiroglu (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-08-31 | |||
25 | Michel Harrer (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-05-10 | |||
28 | Oliver Ritz (until 2008-12-31) | 1989-03-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Emrah Uzun (from 2009-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-08-26 | ||||
9 | Sascha Molders (until 2010-01-27) | 1985-03-20 | |||
11 | Haluk Turkeri (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-11-07 | |||
16 | Chamdin Said (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-10-29 | |||
18 | Markus Kurth (until 2010-06-30) | 1973-07-30 | |||
22 | Samet Alpay (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-03-30 | |||
24 | Silvio Pagano (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-09-12 | |||
26 | Leon Enzmann (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-10-28 | |||
27 | Marcel Platzek (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-05-21 | |||
29 | Vincent Wagner (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-04-05 | |||
41 | Marcel Stiepermann (from 2008-12-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-04-20 | |||
43 | Paul Jans (until 2008-07-31) | 1981-08-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2008-08-09 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |