Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Zsolt Petry (until 2009-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Andre Schubert (from 2009-05-14) (until 2011-06-30) | 1971-07-24 | ||||
Pavel Dotchev (until 2009-05-13) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Asif Saric (until 2014-06-30) | 1965-01-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kasper Jensen (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-10-07 | |||
19 | Nico Burchert (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-06-24 | |||
20 | Sebastian Lange (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-10-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Tom Bertram (from 2009-01-09) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-03-30 | |||
3 | Matthias Holst (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-06-19 | |||
4 | Toni Wachsmuth (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-11-15 | |||
6 | Florian Mohr (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-08-25 | |||
7 | Jens Wemmer (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-10-31 | |||
8 | Karsten Fischer (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-05-27 | |||
14 | Thorsten Becker (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-05-13 | |||
16 | David Krecidlo (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-01-19 | |||
17 | Patrick Reinsch (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-03-21 | |||
23 | Soren Halfar (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-01-02 | |||
24 | Christian Strohdiek (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
26 | Soren Gonther (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-12-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Enis Alushi (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-12-22 | |||
13 | Sebastian Schuppan (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-07-18 | |||
15 | Rolf-Christel Guie-Mien (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-10-28 | |||
18 | Markus Krosche (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
21 | Daniel Bruckner (from 2009-01-09) (until 2016-01-26) | 1981-02-14 | |||
25 | Bjorn Lindemann (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-01-23 | |||
34 | Ardian Jevric (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-07-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Frank Loning (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-08-28 | |||
10 | Sercan Guvenisik (until 2009-12-31) | 1980-03-01 | |||
11 | Domi Kumbela (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-04-20 | |||
12 | Soren Brandy (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-05-06 | |||
21 | Jerome Assauer (until 2008-12-31) | 1988-06-06 | |||
22 | Jovan Damjanovic (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-10-04 | |||
31 | Sven Krause (from 2009-03-27) (until 2010-12-31) | 1986-01-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2008-08-09 19:30 |
1 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |