Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Cesar Thier (until 2011-06-30) | 1967-10-15 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Rangnick (until 2010-12-31) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Zeidler (until 2010-12-31) | 1962-08-08 | ||||
Tomislav Maric (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | ||||
Achim Sarstedt (until 2009-06-30) | 1959-10-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Haas (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
27 | Ramazan Ozcan (until 2009-12-31) | 1984-06-28 | |||
28 | Timo Hildebrand (from 2009-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-04-05 | |||
29 | Daniel Bernhardt (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-08-21 | |||
30 | Thorsten Kirschbaum (until 2009-01-09) | 1987-04-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andreas Beck (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-03-13 | |||
3 | Matthias Jaissle (until 2014-02-13) | 1988-04-05 | |||
5 | Marvin Compper (until 2013-01-24) | 1985-06-14 | |||
6 | Fabricio (from 2009-01-29) (until 2009-06-15) | 1990-02-20 | |||
14 | Christoph Janker (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-02-14 | |||
24 | Per Nilsson (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-09-15 | |||
26 | Andreas Ibertsberger (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-07-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Dragan Paljic (until 2008-08-18) | 1983-04-08 | |||
10 | Selim Teber (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-03-07 | |||
11 | Jochen Seitz (until 2009-01-06) | 1976-10-11 | |||
13 | Zsolt Low (until 2009-01-25) | 1979-04-29 | |||
17 | Tobias Weis (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-07-30 | |||
21 | Luiz Gustavo (until 2010-12-31) | 1987-07-23 | |||
23 | Sejad Salihovic (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-10-08 | |||
25 | Isaac Vorsah (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-06-21 | |||
33 | Carlos Eduardo (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-07-18 | |||
34 | Boris Vukcevic (from 2009-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-03-16 | |||
37 | Jonas Strifler (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-01-30 | |||
39 | Pascal Gross (from 2009-05-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-06-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Demba Ba (until 2011-01-27) | 1985-05-25 | |||
12 | Wellington (from 2008-08-06) (until 2009-08-30) | 1988-02-11 | |||
16 | Kai Herdling (from 2009-01-26) (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-06-27 | |||
18 | Boubacar Sanogo (from 2009-01-27) (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-12-17 | |||
19 | Vedad Ibisevic (until 2012-01-24) | 1984-08-06 | |||
20 | Chinedu Obasi (until 2011-12-31) | 1986-06-01 | |||
22 | Francisco Copado (until 2008-12-16) | 1974-07-19 | |||
36 | Marco Terrazzino (until 2009-06-30) | 1991-04-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2008-08-10 17:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2008-09-24 20:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |