Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jo Stock (until 2009-11-17) | 1963-09-15 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Carsten Muller (from 2010-03-24) (until 2010-06-30) | 1971-10-03 | ||||
Steffen Baumgart (until 2010-03-23) | 1972-01-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Windelband (until 2010-06-30) | 1960-10-03 | ||||
Carsten Muller (until 2010-03-23) | 1971-10-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Matthias Tischer (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-11-09 | |||
12 | Christian Beer (until 2011-12-31) | 1980-11-30 | |||
30 | Konstantin Filatow (until 2009-12-31) | 1989-08-16 | |||
39 | Franco Fluckiger (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-03-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Fabian Jahnel (from 2010-04-28) (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-05-23 | ||||
2 | Silvio Bankert (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-06-13 | |||
3 | Christian Prest (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-09-25 | |||
4 | Robert Littmann (until 2009-12-31) | 1986-02-02 | |||
6 | Andreas Gaebler (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-04-17 | |||
14 | Henrik Gallien (from 2010-05-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-05-27 | |||
15 | Rene Gewelke (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-09-05 | |||
17 | Marcel Probst (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-01-06 | |||
19 | Stephan Neumann (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-04-05 | |||
25 | Tobias Friebertshauser (from 2009-11-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-09-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Robert Low (from 2010-05-22) (until 2010-06-30) | |||||
4 | Hendrik Grossohmichen (from 2010-02-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-06-06 | |||
5 | Simon Tuting (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-09-07 | |||
8 | Catalin Racanel (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-09-23 | |||
13 | Moritz Instenberg (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-03-02 | |||
14 | Pascal Matthias (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-04 | |||
16 | Maximilian Watzka (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-05-25 | |||
18 | Tim Girke (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-12-31) | 1989-06-27 | |||
18 | Marcel Brendel (until 2009-12-31) | 1988-05-18 | |||
20 | Daniel Bauer (until 2011-11-16) | 1982-10-17 | |||
22 | Patrick Bartsch (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-03-27 | |||
23 | Maik Georgi (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-04-06 | |||
23 | Hannes Schock (from 2010-05-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-02-01 | |||
23 | Fabian Falkenberg (from 2010-05-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1992-05-02 | |||
24 | Martin Zander (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-01-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Phillip Glage (from 2010-03-01) (until 2010-03-31) | 1988-10-29 | ||||
7 | Denis Wolf (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-01-15 | |||
9 | Marko Verkic (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-03-02 | |||
10 | Radovan Vujanovic (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-02-18 | |||
11 | Deniz Siga (until 2010-07-31) | 1989-02-01 | |||
21 | Lars Fuchs (from 2009-08-22) (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-06-21 | |||
26 | Maximilian Gerwien (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
26 | Daniel Ujazdowski (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-06-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2009-08-01 19:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |