Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Adam Matysek (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (from 2009-12-22) (until 2012-12-21) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Michael Oenning (until 2009-12-21) | 1965-09-27 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Armin Reutershahn (until 2013-10-07) | 1960-03-01 | ||||
Dirk Bremser (from 2010-02-08) (until 2012-12-21) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Raphael Schafer (until 2017-06-30) | 1979-01-30 | |||
18 | Daniel Klewer (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-03-04 | |||
30 | Alexander Stephan (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-09-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dennis Diekmeier (until 2010-07-15) | 1989-10-20 | |||
3 | Breno (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-10-13 | |||
4 | Havard Nordtveit (from 2009-07-28) (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-06-21 | |||
5 | Andreas Wolf (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-06-12 | |||
6 | Dominic Maroh (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-03-04 | |||
15 | Michael Kammermeyer (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-01-14 | |||
20 | Pascal Bieler (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | |||
23 | Matthew Spiranovic (until 2010-01-06) | 1988-06-27 | |||
25 | Javier Pinola (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-02-24 | |||
31 | Tomasz Welnicki (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-03-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Daniel Gygax (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-08-28 | |||
11 | Marek Mintal (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | |||
12 | Marcel Risse (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-12-17 | |||
13 | Peter Perchtold (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-09-02 | |||
16 | Juri Judt (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-07-24 | |||
17 | Mike Frantz (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-10-14 | |||
21 | Mickael Tavares (from 2010-01-24) (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-10-25 | |||
21 | Dario Vidosic (until 2010-01-18) | 1987-04-08 | |||
22 | Ilkay Gundogan (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | |||
23 | Andreas Ottl (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-03-01 | |||
24 | Peer Kluge (until 2010-01-03) | 1980-11-22 | |||
26 | Thomas Broich (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-01-29 | |||
35 | Jonatan Kotzke (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-03-18 | |||
36 | Jaouhar Mnari (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-11-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Christian Eigler (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
9 | Angelos Charisteas (until 2010-08-15) | 1980-02-09 | |||
10 | Albert Bunjaku (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-11-29 | |||
14 | Eric Maxim Choupo-Moting (from 2009-09-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-03-23 | |||
19 | Isaac Boakye (until 2010-12-19) | 1981-11-26 | |||
33 | Gungor Kaya (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-04-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2009-08-01 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-09-22 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |