Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Holger Bahra (until 2014-06-30) | 1958-03-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 2014-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andre Hofschneider (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-06-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jan Glinker (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
13 | Christoph Haker (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | |||
27 | Carsten Busch (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-08-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
5 | Christian Stuff (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-08-11 | |||
6 | Bernd Rauw (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-01-08 | |||
7 | Patrick Kohlmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-02-25 | |||
14 | Paul Thomik (from 2010-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-25 | |||
15 | Daniel Gohlert (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-09-25 | |||
16 | Christoph Menz (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-12-22 | |||
18 | Daniel Schulz (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-02-21 | |||
24 | Michael Bemben (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-01-28 | |||
29 | Michael Parensen (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Dominic Peitz (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-09-11 | |||
4 | Marco Gebhardt (until 2010-06-30) | 1972-10-07 | |||
8 | Mac Younga-Mouhani (until 2011-06-30) | 1974-08-01 | |||
10 | Huzeyfe Dogan (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
17 | Torsten Mattuschka (until 2014-08-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
20 | David Hollwitz (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-03-20 | |||
23 | Bjorn Brunnemann (until 2011-08-11) | 1980-08-06 | |||
25 | Adrijan Antunovic (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | John Mosquera (until 2012-03-01) | 1988-01-15 | |||
11 | Kenan Sahin (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-10-27 | |||
19 | Chinedu Ede (from 2010-01-03) (until 2012-07-22) | 1987-02-05 | |||
21 | Steven Jahn (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-07-15 | |||
22 | Karim Benyamina (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-12-18 | |||
28 | Shergo Biran (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2009-08-02 14:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |