Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Stephan Kuhnert (until 2014-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Tuchel (from 2009-08-03) (until 2014-06-30) | 1973-08-29 | ||||
Jorn Andersen (until 2009-08-03) | 1963-02-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Arno Michels (from 2009-08-18) (until 2014-06-30) | 1967-09-16 | ||||
Jurgen Kramny (until 2009-08-03) | 1971-10-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dimo Wache (until 2010-06-30) | 1973-11-01 | |||
29 | Christian Wetklo (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-01-11 | |||
30 | Pierre Kleinheider (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-11-07 | |||
33 | Heinz Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-05-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Bo Svensson (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-08-04 | |||
3 | Malik Fathi (from 2010-01-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-10-29 | |||
3 | Peter van der Heyden (until 2010-01-20) | 1976-07-16 | |||
4 | Nikolce Noveski (until 2015-06-30) | 1979-04-28 | |||
5 | Eugen Gopko (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-01-05 | |||
6 | Tim Hoogland (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-06-11 | |||
8 | Radoslav Zabavnik (from 2010-02-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-09-16 | |||
15 | Jan Kirchhoff (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-10-01 | |||
17 | Marco Rose (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-09-11 | |||
24 | Zsolt Low (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-04-29 | |||
26 | Niko Bungert (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-10-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Eugen Polanski (until 2013-01-24) | 1986-03-17 | |||
10 | Jan Simak (from 2010-01-19) (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-10-13 | |||
11 | Filip Trojan (until 2010-08-12) | 1983-02-21 | |||
13 | Milorad Pekovic (until 2010-01-18) | 1977-08-05 | |||
16 | Florian Heller (until 2012-01-11) | 1982-03-10 | |||
18 | Jahmir Hyka (until 2010-08-14) | 1988-03-08 | |||
19 | Elkin Soto (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-08-04 | |||
20 | Jared Jeffrey (from 2010-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-06-14 | |||
21 | Miroslav Karhan (until 2011-06-30) | 1976-06-21 | |||
22 | Chadli Amri (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-12-14 | |||
25 | Andreas Ivanschitz (from 2009-07-18) (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-10-15 | |||
27 | Daniel Gunkel (until 2010-01-12) | 1980-06-07 | |||
35 | Viktor Riske (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Srdjan Baljak (until 2010-01-04) | 1978-11-25 | |||
9 | Felix Borja (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-04-02 | |||
14 | Andre Schurrle (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-11-06 | |||
23 | Aristide Bance (until 2010-08-14) | 1984-09-19 | |||
28 | Adam Szalai (from 2010-01-10) (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-12-09 | |||
28 | Gamal Hamza (until 2009-10-11) | 1981-12-05 | |||
31 | Aleksandar Petreski (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-03-25 | |||
32 | Dragan Bogavac (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-04-07 | |||
43 | Adriano Grimaldi (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-04-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2009-07-31 20:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |