Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Christian Schmidt (until 2011-01-17) | 1971-07-31 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Michael Kruger (from 2009-09-22) (until 2010-05-09) | 1954-05-28 | ||||
Willi Kronhardt (from 2009-09-06) (until 2009-09-21) | 1969-02-17 | ||||
Jurgen Seeberger (until 2009-09-05) | 1965-03-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Willi Kronhardt (until 2010-06-30) | 1969-02-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thorsten Stuckmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-03-17 | |||
13 | Thomas Unger (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | |||
22 | David Hohs (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-03-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Nico Herzig (from 2009-08-17) (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-12-10 | |||
3 | Allan Jepsen (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-07-04 | |||
5 | Lukas Szukala (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-05-26 | |||
12 | Aimen Demai (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-12-10 | |||
17 | Thomas Stehle (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-26 | |||
19 | Seyi Olajengbesi (until 2013-01-29) | 1980-11-17 | |||
26 | Patrick Milchraum (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-05-26 | |||
28 | Mirko Casper (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-03-01 | |||
32 | Timo Achenbach (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-09-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Jerome Polenz (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-11-07 | |||
7 | Reiner Plasshenrich (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-12-12 | |||
10 | Thorsten Burkhardt (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-05-21 | |||
15 | Kevin Kratz (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-01-21 | |||
16 | Florian Muller (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-12-30 | |||
21 | Cristian Fiel (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-03-12 | |||
24 | Daniel Adlung (from 2009-08-05) (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-10-01 | |||
25 | Manuel Junglas (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-01-31 | |||
30 | Andreas Lasnik (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-11-09 | |||
31 | Alper Uludag (from 2009-11-09) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-12-11 | |||
37 | Marco Hoger (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-09-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Gerhards (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | ||||
8 | Szilard Nemeth (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-08-08 | |||
9 | Benjamin Auer (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-01-11 | |||
11 | Markus Daun (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-09-10 | |||
14 | Babacar Gueye (from 2009-07-24) (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-03-02 | |||
23 | Herve Oussale (until 2010-01-06) | 1988-06-16 | |||
33 | Abdul Ozgen (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-09-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2009-08-02 16:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2009-09-23 19:00 |
6 : 4 |
Schema Compare |