Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Klopp (until 2015-06-30) | 1967-06-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Zeljko Buvac (until 2015-06-30) | 1961-09-13 | ||||
Peter Krawietz (until 2015-06-30) | 1972-05-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Roman Weidenfeller (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
20 | Marc Ziegler (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-06-13 | |||
40 | Marcel Hottecke (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-04-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Neven Subotic (until 2017-01-25) | 1988-12-10 | |||
15 | Mats Hummels (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-12-16 | |||
17 | Dede (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-04-18 | |||
21 | Uwe Hunemeier (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-01-09 | |||
25 | Patrick Owomoyela (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-11-05 | |||
27 | Felipe Santana (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-03-17 | |||
29 | Marcel Schmelzer (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
33 | David Vrzogic (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-08-10 | |||
44 | Marc Hornschuh (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-03-02 | |||
45 | Julian Koch (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-11-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Sebastian Kehl (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-13 | |||
6 | Florian Kringe (until 2009-08-30) | 1982-08-18 | |||
7 | Tinga (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-01-13 | |||
8 | Nuri Sahin (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-09-05 | |||
14 | Markus Feulner (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-02-12 | |||
16 | Jakub Blaszczykowski (until 2015-08-31) | 1985-12-14 | |||
19 | Kevin Grosskreutz (until 2015-09-02) | 1988-07-19 | |||
22 | Sven Bender (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
30 | Tamas Hajnal (until 2011-01-30) | 1981-03-15 | |||
31 | Mario Gotze (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-06-03 | |||
36 | Yasin Oztekin (until 2011-01-02) | 1987-03-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Nelson Valdez (until 2010-08-16) | 1983-11-28 | |||
10 | Mohamed Zidan (until 2012-01-30) | 1981-12-11 | |||
11 | Dimitar Rangelow (until 2010-09-06) | 1983-02-09 | |||
13 | Damien Le Tallec (from 2009-08-06) (until 2012-01-30) | 1990-04-19 | |||
13 | Alexander Frei (until 2009-07-15) | 1979-07-15 | |||
18 | Lucas Barrios (from 2009-07-25) (until 2012-05-31) | 1984-11-13 | |||
23 | Christopher Kullmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-09-19 | |||
34 | Bajram Sadrijaj (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-08-10 | |||
39 | Marco Stiepermann (from 2009-12-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-02-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2009-08-01 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-09-22 20:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-10-27 20:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |