Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Antonio Ananijew (until 2010-06-30) | 1965-05-08 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 2011-12-07) | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Feldhoff (until 2011-12-08) | 1974-08-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lars Hirschfeld (until 2010-01-14) | 1978-10-17 | |||
30 | Gerhard Tremmel (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
34 | Frank Lehmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-04-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Thomas Franke (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-21 | |||
3 | Waleri Sokolenko (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-06-21 | |||
6 | Vragel da Silva (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-03-29 | |||
15 | Alexander Bittroff (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-09-19 | |||
17 | Daniel Ziebig (until 2012-12-31) | 1983-01-21 | |||
21 | Savo Pavicevic (until 2009-08-19) | 1980-12-11 | |||
24 | Igor Mitreski (until 2010-01-12) | 1979-02-19 | |||
25 | Markus Brzenska (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-05-25 | |||
27 | Ovidiu Burca (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-03-16 | |||
36 | Peter Hackenberg (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
38 | Adam Straith (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-09-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Stanislaw Angelow (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-04-12 | |||
5 | Sascha Dum (from 2009-08-26) (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-07-03 | |||
5 | Mariusz Kukielka (until 2009-08-26) | 1976-11-07 | |||
7 | Timo Rost (until 2009-12-09) | 1978-08-29 | |||
8 | Roger (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-08-10 | |||
10 | Stiven Rivic (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-08-09 | |||
13 | Julian Borner (from 2009-08-06) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-01-21 | |||
16 | Marco Kurth (until 2012-01-30) | 1978-08-18 | |||
18 | Marc-Andre Kruska (from 2009-08-28) (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-06-29 | |||
20 | Jiayi Shao (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-04-10 | |||
22 | Heiko Schwarz (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-08-23 | |||
28 | Clemens Fandrich (until 2013-01-05) | 1991-01-10 | |||
29 | Dennis Sorensen (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-05-24 | |||
37 | Nils Miatke (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-01-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Emil Jula (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-01-03 | |||
11 | Leonard Kweuke (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-07-12 | |||
14 | Sergiu Radu (until 2011-01-19) | 1977-08-10 | |||
19 | Marc-Philipp Zimmermann (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-03-22 | |||
26 | Nils Petersen (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-12-06 | |||
32 | Adi (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-12-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2009-08-01 19:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-09-22 20:30 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |