Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Mike Barten (from 2009-10-30) (until 2011-06-30) | 1973-11-20 | ||||
Remzo Memic (from 2009-10-01) (until 2009-10-29) | |||||
Mohammed Amiq (until 2009-09-30) | 1949-07-07 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Remzo Memic (from 2009-10-30) (until 2011-06-30) | |||||
Remzo Memic (until 2009-09-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Christian Ahlers-Ceglarek (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-04-18 | |||
31 | Michael Hinz (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-05-07 | |||
40 | Jan Gronewold (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-12-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Julian Matiasovits (from 2010-02-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-11-15 | |||
4 | Bjorn Dreyer (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-01-17 | |||
7 | Francis Banecki (from 2010-01-09) (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-07-17 | |||
9 | Tobias Esche (from 2009-10-31) (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-02-03 | |||
15 | Nico Streater (from 2010-01-29) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-01-05 | |||
16 | Christopher Beck (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-11-12 | |||
26 | Nils Laabs (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-02-29 | |||
27 | Sedat Yucel (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-01-28 | |||
29 | Marin Mandic (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-08-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Viktor Pekrul (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-12-19 | |||
6 | Patrick Posipal (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-03-03 | |||
6 | Marius Winkelmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-11-21 | |||
8 | Adil Boukantar (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-04-07 | |||
13 | Fabrizio Muzzicato (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-04-03 | |||
15 | Thomas Goktas (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-03-13 | |||
17 | Jan-Philipp Rose (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-12-16 | |||
20 | Yusuf Adewunmi (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-11-05 | |||
22 | Danny Cornelius (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-04-13 | |||
23 | Daniel Block (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-09-21 | |||
24 | Benjamin Titz (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-02-10 | |||
28 | Benedetto Muzzicato (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-09-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Yasin Bilgin (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-06-26 | |||
18 | Mike Behrens (until 2010-12-31) | 1989-03-23 | |||
19 | Alessandro Belleri (from 2010-02-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-02-10 | |||
25 | Bunyamin Aksoy (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-05-18 | |||
27 | Aleksandre Karapetian (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-12-23 | |||
28 | Mert Yaman (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-04-16 | |||
30 | Christian Maus (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-04-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2009-08-02 14:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |