Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Thomas Kohler (until 2010-06-30) | 1967-06-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Emmerling (from 2010-03-30) (until 2012-08-25) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Henri Fuchs (from 2010-03-26) (until 2010-03-29) | 1970-06-23 | ||||
Rainer Horgl (until 2010-03-25) | 1957-03-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Henri Fuchs (until 2010-03-25) | 1970-06-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dirk Orlishausen (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-08-15 | |||
19 | Andreas Sponsel (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-03-03 | |||
25 | Jonas Heidrich (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-11-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Rinik Carolus (until 2009-08-31) | 1987-02-06 | |||
3 | Norman Loose (until 2009-07-31) | 1980-01-10 | |||
4 | Dennis Malura (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-06-20 | |||
5 | Martin Pohl (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-04-13 | |||
15 | Christopher Handke (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
21 | Jens Mockel (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-02-21 | |||
23 | Dennis Hillebrand (from 2009-09-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-11-30 | |||
24 | Bastian Pinske (until 2009-12-31) | 1978-09-19 | |||
26 | Thomas Strohl (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Manuel Bolstler (from 2009-08-27) (until 2010-07-21) | 1983-04-26 | |||
6 | Samil Cinaz (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-03-08 | |||
8 | Sebastian Becker (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-04-10 | |||
10 | Thiago Rockenbach (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-02-01 | |||
13 | Julien Humbert (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-06-23 | |||
14 | Fabian Stenzel (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-10-07 | |||
16 | Matthias Pessolat (until 2010-01-21) | 1985-03-26 | |||
17 | Gianluca Simari (until 2010-12-31) | 1990-04-22 | |||
18 | Martin Hauswald (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-03-03 | |||
29 | Matti Langer (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-02-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Chhunly Pagenburg (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-11-10 | |||
9 | Julian Luttmann (from 2010-02-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-04-19 | |||
9 | Massimo Cannizzaro (until 2010-01-03) | 1981-04-03 | |||
11 | Petr Smisek (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-01-22 | |||
20 | Tino Semmer (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-09-25 | |||
22 | Fabian Montabell (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-02-13 | |||
27 | Carsten Kammlott (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-02-28 | |||
30 | Christian Beck (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-03-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2009-08-02 16:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |