Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rene Keffel (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (from 2010-02-09) (until 2011-02-26) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Steffen Menze (from 2009-10-06) (until 2010-02-08) | 1969-01-28 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Boysen (until 2009-10-06) | 1957-05-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Tobias Dudeck (until 2011-04-30) | 1980-11-06 | ||||
Steffen Menze (until 2009-10-05) | 1969-01-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Endres (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-05-16 | |||
25 | Maurice Paul (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-02-03 | |||
28 | Robert Wulnikowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-07-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Huckle (from 2009-08-01) (until 2010-01-31) | 1983-11-04 | ||||
2 | Alexander Huber (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-02-25 | |||
3 | Nils Teixeira (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-07-10 | |||
3 | Daniel Goldschmitt (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-12-22 | |||
5 | Maik Schutzbach (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-05-31 | |||
6 | Martin Hysky (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-09-25 | |||
13 | Marc Heitmeier (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-03-18 | |||
21 | Mounir Chaftar (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-01-29 | |||
26 | Marko Kopilas (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-07-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Tufan Tosunoglu (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-07-22 | |||
11 | Christian Frohlich (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-10-27 | |||
14 | Marius Laux (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-07 | |||
15 | Christian Pospischil (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-05-14 | |||
16 | Sebastian Rode (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-10-11 | |||
17 | Stefan Zinnow (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-05-28 | |||
18 | Steffen Haas (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-03-18 | |||
19 | Simon Pospischil (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-01 | |||
23 | Nils Pfingsten-Reddig (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-05-23 | |||
24 | Benjamin Baier (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-07-23 | |||
27 | Tom Moosmayer (from 2010-01-28) (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-10-01 | |||
32 | Baris Odabas (from 2010-05-08) (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-02-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | David Ulm (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
9 | Matthias Morys (until 2009-07-30) | 1987-03-19 | |||
10 | Suat Turker (until 2010-01-21) | 1976-03-10 | |||
20 | Mirnes Mesic (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-03-16 | |||
22 | Ugur Albayrak (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-06-08 | |||
26 | Kai Hesse (from 2010-01-07) (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-06-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2009-08-02 17:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |