Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Marc Fascher (from 2010-03-21) (until 2012-01-23) | 1968-08-04 | ||||
Roger Schmidt (until 2010-03-19) | 1967-03-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Tobias Stock (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-10-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | David Buchholz (until 2011-12-31) | 1984-08-05 | |||
22 | Daniel Riemer (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-02-17 | |||
26 | Kieran Schulze-Marmeling (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-05-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Louis Rytina (until 2010-06-30) | 1993-01-07 | ||||
2 | David Fall (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-02-27 | |||
3 | Max Mumken (from 2010-01-29) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-04-05 | |||
4 | Orhan Ozkara (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-01-01 | |||
5 | Guerino Capretti (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-02-05 | |||
6 | Marc-Andre Nimptsch (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
8 | Arthur Matlik (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | |||
17 | Jens Grembowietz (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-02-02 | |||
21 | Harry Pufal (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-10-12 | |||
30 | Jens Wissing (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
10 | Mehmet Kara (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-11-21 | |||
11 | Marvin Bakalorz (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-09-13 | |||
14 | Julian Loose (until 2012-01-25) | 1985-05-17 | |||
15 | Konstantin Mollering (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-06-09 | |||
16 | Julian Westermann (from 2010-05-21) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-04-19 | |||
16 | David Lauretta (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-09-15 | |||
19 | Ivica Ivicevic (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-06-19 | |||
23 | Massimo Ornatelli (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-01-17 | |||
25 | Rafael Maccauro (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-09-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Enes Demir (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-10-25 | ||||
7 | Sami El-Nounou (until 2010-01-22) | 1979-05-31 | |||
9 | Michael Erzen (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-06-03 | |||
18 | Timo Scherping (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-04-18 | |||
20 | Wojciech Pollok (until 2011-08-28) | 1982-06-25 | |||
25 | Marc Lorenz (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-07-18 | |||
29 | Wilson Pereira (until 2009-12-31) | 1988-11-16 | |||
33 | Jerome Assauer (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-06-06 | |||
80 | Sercan Guvenisik (from 2010-01-01) (until 2012-01-25) | 1980-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2009-08-01 19:30 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |