Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Miloslav Janovsky (from 2010-02-10) (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-06-06 | ||||
Gino Lettieri (until 2010-02-09) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Payer (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-01-10 | ||||
Andreas Lengsfeld (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-05-16 | ||||
1 | Florian Schurenberg (until 2009-12-31) | 1985-09-07 | |||
21 | Jonas Sela (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-01-23 | |||
27 | Patrick Rosch (until 2010-12-31) | 1989-06-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Jens Matthies (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-06-29 | |||
3 | Marcel Mayr (until 2010-12-31) | 1977-05-11 | |||
4 | Michael Kummerle (from 2009-07-27) (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-04-21 | |||
5 | Alexander Konjevic (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-10-17 | |||
8 | Tobias Plossner (from 2010-05-22) (until 2010-05-31) | ||||
9 | Florian Schrepel (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-10-23 | |||
13 | Rene Okle (until 2010-12-31) | 1983-01-01 | |||
13 | Philipp Peter (from 2010-05-15) (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-07-22 | |||
16 | Maximilian Prechtl (from 2010-05-22) (until 2010-05-31) | ||||
17 | Mischa Welm (until 2010-12-31) | 1984-01-09 | |||
23 | Tobias Zott (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-08-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Sebastian Szikal (from 2009-08-01) (until 2010-12-31) | 1986-11-17 | |||
6 | Stefan Seufert (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-05-10 | |||
7 | Alberto Mendez (until 2010-12-31) | 1974-10-24 | |||
11 | Alexander Geiger (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-12-21 | |||
12 | Andreas Schumacher (until 2010-12-31) | 1981-06-02 | |||
14 | Ralph Egeter (until 2010-12-31) | 1990-08-18 | |||
15 | Michael Planitz (until 2010-12-31) | 1987-07-16 | |||
16 | Maximilian Zang (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-01-16 | |||
17 | Felix Peter (from 2010-05-15) (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-07-22 | |||
18 | Norbert Ferstl (from 2010-05-15) (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-01-23 | |||
18 | Eduard Root (from 2010-05-22) (until 2010-05-31) | 1991-10-17 | |||
18 | Marc Hammerle (until 2010-01-28) | 1985-12-19 | |||
20 | Akram Abdel-Haq (until 2010-12-31) | 1979-09-28 | |||
22 | Tolgay Asma (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-12-18 | |||
22 | Daniel Klempau (from 2010-05-22) (until 2010-05-31) | 1985-12-24 | |||
28 | Philipp Bydkiewski (from 2010-05-15) (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-05-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Andreas Fischer (until 2010-12-31) | 1981-11-07 | |||
10 | Sokol Kacani (until 2011-01-31) | 1984-02-16 | |||
19 | Tobias Wiesner (until 2011-01-30) | 1990-07-31 | |||
22 | Johannes Zeitler (from 2010-05-15) (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-07-17 | |||
24 | Vittorio Romano (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-12-31) | 1990-01-04 | |||
25 | Thomas Wildenauer (from 2010-05-22) (until 2010-12-31) | ||||
26 | Sven Seitz (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-02-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2009-08-01 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |