Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Sebastian Rauch (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-09-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dietmar Demuth (until 2012-05-14) | 1955-01-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jens Hartel (until 2011-06-30) | 1969-06-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marian Unger (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-11-17 | |||
23 | Daniel Zacher (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-11-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Filip Krstic (from 2010-02-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-09-24 | |||
7 | Matthias Rudolph (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
14 | Joan Oumari (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-08-19 | |||
20 | Ronny Surma (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-04-17 | |||
21 | Onur Bayram (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-04-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Rainer Muller (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-05-15 | |||
5 | Denis Weidlich (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-07-08 | |||
6 | Anton Muller (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-10-22 | |||
8 | Patrick Moritz (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-10-22 | |||
10 | Sven Hartwig (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-07-08 | |||
11 | Felix Dojahn (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-02-16 | |||
15 | Rico Eichstadt (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-06-18 | |||
17 | Julian Prochnow (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-07-01 | |||
19 | Umit Ergirdi (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-11-05 | |||
25 | Almedin Civa (until 2012-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | |||
26 | Guido Kocer (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-09-15 | |||
33 | Bjorn Laars (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-12-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Clemens Lange (until 2009-12-31) | 1986-04-23 | |||
16 | Daniel Frahn (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-06-03 | |||
18 | Erkan Kilicaslan (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-04-05 | |||
20 | Stefan Kutschke (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-11-03 | |||
30 | Tobias Francisco (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-03-31 | |||
31 | Nicolas Hebisch (until 2012-12-31) | 1990-03-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2009-07-31 20:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |