Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Bernd Meier (from 2010-01-06) (until 2011-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | ||||
Uwe Gospodarek (from 2009-09-23) (until 2009-12-31) | 1973-08-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Press (until 2010-08-09) | 1965-10-31 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Fenk (until 2010-06-30) | 1967 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Manuel Riemann (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-09-09 | |||
24 | Andreas Michl (until 2011-01-09) | 1980-01-29 | |||
29 | Egon Weber (from 2009-12-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-01-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sergej Jakirovic (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-12-23 | ||||
2 | Patrick Wolf (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-02-12 | |||
5 | Martin Schmidt (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-05-24 | |||
6 | Michael Kokocinski (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-02-07 | |||
8 | Sven Kresin (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-07-12 | |||
14 | Christoph Burkhard (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-11-09 | |||
16 | Thomas Mayer (until 2009-09-08) | 1984-02-06 | |||
18 | Benjamin Gorka (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-04-15 | |||
19 | Daniel Pirker (until 2009-12-31) | 1990-06-12 | |||
22 | Marco Holz (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-01-31 | |||
23 | Thomas Leberfinger (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-01-05 | |||
25 | Patrick Kirsch (from 2010-01-28) (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Oliver Stadlbauer (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-04-13 | ||||
3 | Ronald Schmidt (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-04-28 | |||
4 | Bjorn Hertl (until 2011-06-30) | 1976-08-10 | |||
7 | Christian Holzer (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-01-20 | |||
10 | Bajram Nebihi (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-08-05 | |||
17 | Sascha Traut (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-05-21 | |||
20 | Christian Brucia (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-02-02 | |||
26 | Andreas Niederquell (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-11-18 | |||
33 | Markus Grubl (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-08-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Alessandro Belleri (until 2010-01-31) | 1985-02-10 | |||
13 | Thomas Hamberger (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
16 | Fikri El Haj Ali (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-11-17 | |||
21 | Thomas Kurz (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-04-03 | |||
27 | Christian Cappek (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-07-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2009-08-01 19:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |