Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Steffen Vogler (until 2014-06-30) | 1966-06-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Gino Lettieri (from 2010-02-10) (until 2012-02-15) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Hans-Werner Moser (until 2010-02-09) | 1964-09-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sandro Schwarz (until 2010-03-08) | 1978-10-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Erik Domaschke (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-11-11 | |||
23 | Marc Birkenbach (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-02-12 | |||
31 | Stefan Marinovic (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-10-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Florian Hubner (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-03-01 | |||
3 | Thorsten Barg (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-08-25 | |||
4 | Tunay Acar (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-04-30 | |||
4 | Kristjan Glibo (until 2009-12-31) | 1982-04-01 | |||
5 | Kai Gehring (until 2011-01-18) | 1988-02-12 | |||
6 | Benjamin Hubner (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-07-04 | |||
17 | Lukas Billick (until 2011-01-08) | 1988-02-09 | |||
20 | Benjamin Weigelt (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-09-04 | |||
26 | Torge Hollmann (until 2010-07-15) | 1982-01-28 | |||
34 | Fabian Schonheim (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-02-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Bjorn Ziegenbein (until 2010-08-18) | 1986-04-30 | |||
8 | Steffen Bohl (until 2010-12-31) | 1983-12-28 | |||
11 | Josip Landeka (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-04-20 | |||
13 | Philipp Albert (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-04-15 | |||
15 | Sebastian Reinert (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-04-20 | |||
18 | Christian Kunert (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-08-04 | |||
22 | Sascha Amstatter (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-11-08 | |||
25 | Sebastian Wolf (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-12-31) | 1985-01-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Danko Boskovic (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-01-27 | |||
19 | Suat Turker (from 2010-01-22) (until 2011-01-18) | 1976-03-10 | |||
24 | Dominik Stroh-Engel (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-11-27 | |||
25 | Bakary Diakite (until 2009-08-02) | 1980-11-09 | |||
27 | Aykut Ozturk (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-11-07 | |||
30 | Sebastian Szimayer (from 2009-08-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-05-15 | |||
38 | Marcel Ziemer (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-08-03 | |||
44 | Jovan Damjanovic (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-10-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2009-07-31 20:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |