Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Zsolt Petry (until 2014-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | ||||
Cesar Thier (until 2011-06-30) | 1967-10-15 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Rangnick (until 2010-12-31) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Zeidler (until 2010-12-31) | 1962-08-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Haas (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
27 | Ramazan Ozcan (until 2009-12-31) | 1984-06-28 | |||
28 | Timo Hildebrand (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-04-05 | |||
30 | Jens Grahl (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-09-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andreas Beck (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-03-13 | |||
3 | Matthias Jaissle (until 2014-02-13) | 1988-04-05 | |||
5 | Marvin Compper (until 2013-01-24) | 1985-06-14 | |||
8 | Christian Eichner (until 2010-12-31) | 1982-11-24 | |||
14 | Josip Simunic (until 2011-08-30) | 1978-02-18 | |||
22 | Jukka Raitala (from 2009-08-31) (until 2010-08-30) | 1988-09-15 | |||
24 | Per Nilsson (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-09-15 | |||
26 | Andreas Ibertsberger (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-07-27 | |||
35 | Kevin Conrad (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-08-10 | |||
37 | Manuel Gulde (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-12 | |||
42 | Philipp Klingmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-04-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Maicosuel (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-06-16 | |||
10 | Carlos Eduardo (until 2010-08-20) | 1987-07-18 | |||
17 | Tobias Weis (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-07-30 | |||
21 | Luiz Gustavo (until 2010-12-31) | 1987-07-23 | |||
23 | Sejad Salihovic (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-10-08 | |||
25 | Isaac Vorsah (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-06-21 | |||
31 | Andreas Ludwig (from 2010-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-09-11 | |||
34 | Boris Vukcevic (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-03-16 | |||
36 | Franco Zuculini (until 2010-07-22) | 1990-09-05 | |||
39 | Pascal Gross (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-06-15 | |||
40 | Jonas Strifler (until 2009-08-30) | 1990-01-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Demba Ba (until 2011-01-27) | 1985-05-25 | |||
11 | Marco Terrazzino (until 2010-06-30) | 1991-04-15 | |||
12 | Wellington (until 2009-08-30) | 1988-02-11 | |||
16 | Kai Herdling (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-06-27 | |||
18 | Prince Tagoe (until 2011-01-30) | 1986-11-09 | |||
19 | Vedad Ibisevic (until 2012-01-24) | 1984-08-06 | |||
20 | Chinedu Obasi (until 2011-12-31) | 1986-06-01 | |||
29 | Adam Jabiri (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-06-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2009-08-02 14:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-09-22 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2009-10-28 20:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2010-02-09 20:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |