Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Schubert (until 2011-11-07) | 1966-06-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ingo Popp (until 2011-06-30) | 1964-12-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ole Oberbeck (until 2011-06-30) | 1970-11-28 | ||||
1 | Nourreddine Semghoun (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-10-29 | |||
21 | Fynn Berndt (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-10-01 | |||
24 | Maximilian Hinterkopf (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-05-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Christoph Bergmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-08-19 | |||
4 | Dennis Wehrendt (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-02-25 | |||
5 | Timo Neumann (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-05-09 | |||
13 | Patrick Peters (until 2010-12-31) | 1987-11-07 | |||
14 | Nils Lange (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-06-15 | |||
15 | Jan Prussmann (until 2009-12-31) | 1990-01-15 | |||
23 | Michael Hohnstedt (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-05-03 | |||
25 | Moritz Hinkelmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-11-07 | |||
26 | Moritz Marheineke (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | |||
33 | Rouven Schroder (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-10-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Philipp Rohr (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-10-11 | |||
7 | Domagoj Duspara (from 2010-06-30) (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-10-31 | |||
7 | Hendrik Helmke (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-07-13 | |||
8 | Enzo Testa (until 2009-12-31) | 1989-06-20 | |||
16 | Christoph Nodop (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-08-04 | |||
19 | Rafael Pollack (from 2009-09-10) (until 2009-12-31) | 1988-10-28 | |||
20 | Marcel Gebers (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-06-05 | |||
22 | Gerrit Lange (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-03-23 | |||
27 | Romano Lindner (until 2009-12-31) | 1985-01-17 | |||
28 | Nico Schrum (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-12-21 | |||
30 | Andre Senger (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-02-20 | |||
33 | Marcello Meyer (from 2010-04-30) (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-10-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jakob Sachs (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-09-07 | |||
10 | Rolf Landerl (until 2011-06-30) | 1975-10-24 | |||
11 | Stefan Richter (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-27 | |||
17 | Liridon Imeri (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-08-23 | |||
18 | Bastian Henning (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-05-27 | |||
32 | Clemens Lange (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-04-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2009-07-31 20:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2009-09-23 20:30 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |