Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Kunkel (from 2009-12-27) (until 2011-06-30) | 1956-02-10 | ||||
Dirk Wissel (until 2010-06-30) | 1969-03-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Berger (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-03-10 | |||
12 | Thorben Gunkel (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-01-04 | |||
23 | Marcel Grote (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-05-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Christian Hinz (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-10-27 | ||||
2 | Jaroslaw Stankiewicz (until 2011-06-30) | 1975-07-21 | |||
4 | Christian Floth (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-05-26 | |||
16 | Kevin Corvers (until 2010-06-30) | 1987-08-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Sven Schmidt (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-05-31 | ||||
Kurt Saterdag (from 2009-10-31) (until 2009-12-31) | 1985-05-02 | ||||
6 | Dennis Hupperts (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-11-02 | |||
7 | Rafael Synowiec (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-09-06 | |||
8 | Hasan Ramadani (until 2010-01-17) | 1981-06-01 | |||
11 | Marius Lippa (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-08-07 | |||
13 | Jens Klusmayer (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-08-07 | |||
14 | Tansu Tokmak (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-02-17 | |||
17 | Kamil Kuzniarz (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-07-05 | |||
17 | Arne Janssen (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-03-16 | |||
20 | Kadir Mutluer (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-10-10 | |||
21 | Alexander Scheelen (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-06-25 | |||
22 | Tahar Elidrissi (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-11-15 | |||
27 | Christoph Zilgens (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Wilson Pereira (from 2010-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-11-16 | ||||
9 | Thomas Putters (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-08-05 | |||
10 | Oktay Guney (until 2010-06-30) | 1980-09-06 | |||
18 | Senad Beric (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-06-10 | |||
19 | Apostolos Sakalakis (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-05-23 | |||
55 | Birkan Yilmaz (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-03-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2009-08-02 14:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |