Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Adam Matysek (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (until 2012-12-21) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Armin Reutershahn (until 2013-10-07) | 1960-03-01 | ||||
Dirk Bremser (until 2012-12-21) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Raphael Schafer (until 2017-06-30) | 1979-01-30 | |||
12 | Daniel Klewer (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-03-04 | |||
24 | Timo Ochs (from 2010-12-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-10-17 | |||
30 | Alexander Stephan (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-09-15 | |||
32 | Daniel Batz (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-01-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dennis Diekmeier (until 2010-07-15) | 1989-10-20 | |||
3 | Per Nilsson (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-09-15 | |||
5 | Andreas Wolf (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-06-12 | |||
6 | Dominic Maroh (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-03-04 | |||
20 | Pascal Bieler (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | |||
25 | Javier Pinola (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-02-24 | |||
26 | Timothy Chandler (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-29 | |||
33 | Felicio Brown Forbes (until 2011-01-18) | 1991-08-28 | |||
38 | Philipp Wollscheid (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-03-06 | |||
40 | Marvin Plattenhardt (from 2010-10-02) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-01-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Timmy Simons (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
11 | Marek Mintal (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | |||
13 | Jens Hegeler (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
14 | Robert Mak (until 2014-07-19) | 1991-03-08 | |||
16 | Juri Judt (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-07-24 | |||
17 | Mike Frantz (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-10-14 | |||
18 | Almog Cohen (until 2013-02-03) | 1988-09-01 | |||
21 | Dario Vidosic (until 2010-12-31) | 1987-04-08 | |||
22 | Ilkay Gundogan (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | |||
31 | Julian Wiessmeier (from 2011-05-14) (until 2012-08-28) | 1992-11-04 | |||
37 | Mehmet Ekici (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-03-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Christian Eigler (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
9 | Angelos Charisteas (until 2010-08-15) | 1980-02-09 | |||
10 | Albert Bunjaku (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-11-29 | |||
15 | Christoph Sauter (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-08-03 | |||
19 | Nassim Ben Khalifa (from 2011-01-09) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-01-13 | |||
19 | Isaac Boakye (until 2010-12-19) | 1981-11-26 | |||
23 | Julian Schieber (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-02-13 | |||
29 | Rubin Okotie (until 2011-08-10) | 1987-06-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2010-08-15 16:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2010-10-27 20:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-01-19 19:15 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2011-01-25 20:30 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |