Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Hans Spillmann (from 2011-01-18) (until 2012-09-02) | 1969-06-02 | ||||
Christian Schmidt (until 2011-01-17) | 1971-07-31 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Peter Hyballa (until 2011-09-12) | 1975-12-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Eric van der Luer (until 2011-09-12) | 1965-08-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thorsten Stuckmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-03-17 | |||
13 | Thomas Unger (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | |||
22 | David Hohs (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-03-16 | |||
34 | Tim Krumpen (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-11-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Nico Herzig (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-12-10 | |||
3 | Andreas Korte (from 2010-12-01) (until 2012-07-17) | 1989-03-23 | |||
4 | Sebastian Jansen (from 2010-12-10) (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-11-10 | |||
5 | Tobias Feisthammel (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-02-22 | |||
12 | Aimen Demai (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-12-10 | |||
17 | Thomas Stehle (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-26 | |||
19 | Seyi Olajengbesi (until 2013-01-29) | 1980-11-17 | |||
28 | Mirko Casper (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-03-01 | |||
29 | Robert Wilschrey (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-06-27 | |||
32 | Timo Achenbach (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-09-03 | |||
42 | Patrizio Frau (from 2010-12-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-03-03 | |||
43 | Shervin Radjabali-Fardi (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-05-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Zoltan Stieber (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-10-16 | |||
8 | Thomas Zdebel (until 2011-06-30) | 1973-05-25 | |||
10 | Thorsten Burkhardt (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-05-21 | |||
15 | Kevin Kratz (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-01-21 | |||
16 | Florian Muller (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-12-30 | |||
18 | Tolgay Arslan (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-08-16 | |||
25 | Manuel Junglas (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-01-31 | |||
30 | Narciso Lubaca (from 2010-10-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-03-07 | |||
31 | Alper Uludag (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-12-11 | |||
37 | Marco Hoger (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-09-16 | |||
44 | Bilal Cubukcu (from 2011-01-02) (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-05-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Gerhards (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | ||||
9 | Benjamin Auer (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-01-11 | |||
11 | Markus Daun (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-09-10 | |||
14 | Babacar Gueye (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-03-02 | |||
20 | Henrik Ojamaa (until 2011-01-13) | 1991-05-20 | |||
21 | Juvhel Tsoumou (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-12-27 | |||
33 | Daniel Engelbrecht (from 2010-12-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-11-05 | |||
45 | Sergiu Radu (from 2011-01-20) (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-08-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2010-08-15 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2010-10-27 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2010-12-22 20:30 |
5 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-01-26 20:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |