Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Schadlich (until 2013-10-06) | 1952-12-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Torsten Bittermann (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-02-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Philipp Pentke (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-05-01 | |||
22 | Sebastian Klomich (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-12-22 | |||
30 | Stefan Schmidt (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-03-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Silvio Bankert (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-06-13 | |||
4 | Rene Gewelke (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-09-05 | |||
15 | Chris Lowe (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-04-16 | |||
18 | Marcel Baude (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-10-05 | |||
21 | Marcel Wilke (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-06-26 | |||
25 | Raphael Schaschko (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-06-07 | |||
27 | Rene Trehkopf (until 2012-01-30) | 1980-04-08 | |||
28 | Andreas Richter (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-09-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Kevin Hampf (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-03-24 | |||
5 | Jorg Emmerich (until 2011-06-30) | 1974-03-09 | |||
7 | Ronny Garbuschewski (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-02-23 | |||
8 | Carsten Strasser (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-07-05 | |||
13 | Christian Frohlich (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-10-27 | |||
14 | Marcel Schlosser (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-08-08 | |||
17 | Matthias Pessolat (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-03-26 | |||
19 | Kevin Vietz (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-30 | |||
24 | Simon Tuting (from 2011-01-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-09-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Romas Dressler (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-10-16 | |||
10 | Benjamin Forster (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-11-14 | |||
20 | Steffen Kellig (until 2010-08-30) | 1981-02-04 | |||
23 | Tobias Kurbjuweit (from 2011-01-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-12-30 | |||
33 | Pavel Dobry (from 2010-08-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-02-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2010-08-14 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2010-10-27 20:30 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |