Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Zdenko Miletic (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jos Luhukay (until 2012-06-30) | 1963-06-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rob Reekers (until 2012-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Markus Gellhaus (until 2012-06-30) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simon Jentzsch (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
30 | Mohamed Amsif (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-02-07 | |||
37 | Ioannis Gelios (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-04-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Paul Verhaegh (until 2017-08-06) | 1983-09-01 | |||
3 | Gibril Sankoh (until 2013-02-06) | 1983-05-15 | |||
4 | Dominik Reinhardt (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-12-19 | |||
5 | Uwe Mohrle (until 2011-12-31) | 1979-12-03 | |||
6 | Jonas De Roeck (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-12-20 | |||
17 | Marcel de Jong (until 2015-01-28) | 1986-10-15 | |||
18 | Jan-Ingwer Callsen-Bracker (from 2011-01-01) (until 2018-01-14) | 1984-09-23 | |||
19 | Stefan Buck (until 2010-07-22) | 1980-09-03 | |||
22 | Lukas Sinkiewicz (from 2010-07-22) (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-10-09 | |||
34 | Benjamin Woltmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-06-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Hajime Hosogai (from 2011-01-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-06-10 | |||
8 | Axel Bellinghausen (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | |||
10 | Daniel Baier (until 2020-07-23) | 1984-05-18 | |||
13 | Tobias Werner (until 2016-08-02) | 1985-07-19 | |||
14 | Kees Kwakman (from 2010-08-30) (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-06-10 | |||
16 | Ibrahima Traore (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-04-21 | |||
18 | Goran Sukalo (until 2010-08-26) | 1981-08-24 | |||
19 | Soren Bertram (from 2010-08-19) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
20 | Marcel Ndjeng (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-05-06 | |||
23 | Andrew Sinkala (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-06-18 | |||
24 | Daniel Brinkmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-01-29 | |||
28 | Moritz Leitner (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-12-08 | |||
29 | Moritz Nebel (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-25 | |||
32 | Thomas Rudolph (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-02-20 | |||
33 | Daniel Framberger (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-05-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Edmond Kapllani (until 2010-08-30) | 1982-07-31 | |||
9 | Torsten Oehrl (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-01-07 | |||
11 | Nando Rafael (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-10 | |||
27 | Michael Thurk (until 2012-01-01) | 1976-05-28 | |||
36 | Stephan Hain (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-09-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2010-08-14 19:30 |
1 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2010-10-26 19:00 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2010-12-21 20:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |