Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wendelin Guster (until 2011-06-30) | 1955-10-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frederic Palmstorfer (until 2011-06-30) | 1993-02-03 | ||||
1 | Frank Steigelmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
18 | Raphael Marhofer (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-09-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Fabian Herchenhan (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-10-28 | ||||
Emre Anuk (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-05-22 | ||||
2 | Markus Lechner (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-04-02 | |||
4 | Patrick Hildebrandt (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-07-06 | |||
7 | Jens Schaufler (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-10-26 | |||
8 | Julian Graf (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-11-05 | |||
19 | Kim Schenk (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-07-06 | |||
22 | Jens Mayer (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-08-01 | |||
24 | Mathaus Gornik (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-11-03 | |||
26 | Jens Ehrstein (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-01-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Christian Kuhl (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-03-04 | |||
5 | Jochen Ellermann (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-11-10 | |||
6 | Marc Buchmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-08-22 | |||
11 | Christoph Weller (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-05 | |||
13 | Attila Baum (until 2015-08-06) | 1986-05-20 | |||
14 | Thomas Rekus (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-01-07 | |||
15 | Aleksander Burch (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-09-22 | |||
17 | Christian Singer (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-12-20 | |||
20 | Sebastian Kuhnhardt (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-02-08 | |||
23 | Thomas Fest (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-01-22 | |||
25 | Dominik Grunnagel (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-12-06 | |||
27 | Alexander Ernst (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-12-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Sebastian Reich (until 2010-12-31) | 1980-05-07 | |||
10 | Daniel Preuss (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-06-23 | |||
12 | Mark Hoffmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-05-07 | |||
16 | Xavier Novic (until 2011-11-30) | 1988-04-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2010-08-14 15:30 |
1 : 11 |
Schema Compare |